This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:16:47 (UTC).

Rachel Johnson v. Yahoo! Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 Rachel Johnson filed an Other lawsuit against Yahoo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RACHEL JOHNSON, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellee

YAHOO! INC., now known as OATH HOLDINGS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Keith J. Keogh

Attorney at KEOGH LAW, LTD

55 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Timothy J. Sostrin

Attorney at KEOGH LAW, LTD

55 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Timothy Loose

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Christopher Chorba

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Perlette M. Jura

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachel Johnson. [9] [6978104] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/15/2019 04:12 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachel Johnson. [8] [6977394] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:34 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#14

(#14) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/13/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/03/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson. JNS [6979665] [19-1001] (AG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:15 PM]

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy J. Sostrin for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [2] [6975631] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:55 AM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [10] [6979566] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:01 PM]

#13

(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy W. Loose for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [13] [6979569] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Loose, Timothy) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:07 PM]

#12

(#12) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Perlette M. Jura for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [12] [6979568] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Jura, Perlette) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:05 PM]

#15

(#15) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/13/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/03/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson JNS [6984378] [19-1001] (AP) [Entered: 02/14/2019 08:52 AM]

#11

(#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christopher Chorba for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [11] [6979567] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Chorba, Christopher) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:03 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of service for Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Keith Keogh for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [4] [6975641] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Keogh, Keith) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:06 AM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Rachel Johnson. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-8001, 18-8012. [3] [6975633] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:57 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/25/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/27/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/17/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson. JNS [6976695] [19-1001] (FP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:42 AM]

#6

(#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [6] [6976694] [19-1001] (FP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:33 AM]

#1

Civil Case

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Keith Keogh for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [5] [6975645] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001]-[Edited 01/04/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Keogh, Keith) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:20 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/13/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/03/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson JNS [6984378] [19-1001] (AP) [Entered: 02/14/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/13/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/12/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/03/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson. JNS [6979665] [19-1001] (AG) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy W. Loose for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [13] [6979569] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Loose, Timothy) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Perlette M. Jura for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [12] [6979568] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Jura, Perlette) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christopher Chorba for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [11] [6979567] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Chorba, Christopher) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. for Appellee Yahoo! Inc.. [10] [6979566] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] [Edited 01/23/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Boutrous, Theodore) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachel Johnson. [9] [6978104] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/15/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachel Johnson. [8] [6977394] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 02/25/2019 for Rachel Johnson. Appellee's brief due on or before 03/27/2019 for Yahoo! Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/17/2019 for Appellant Rachel Johnson. JNS [6976695] [19-1001] (FP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, January 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [6] [6976694] [19-1001] (FP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Keith Keogh for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [5] [6975645] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001]-[Edited 01/04/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Keogh, Keith) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of service for Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Keith Keogh for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [4] [6975641] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Keogh, Keith) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Rachel Johnson. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 16-8001, 18-8012. [3] [6975633] [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Timothy J. Sostrin for Appellant Rachel Johnson. [2] [6975631] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1001] (Sostrin, Timothy) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rachel Johnson by 01/04/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 01/16/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/11/2019 for Rachel Johnson. [1] [6974998] [19-1001] (AG) [Entered: 01/02/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.