This case was last updated from PACER on 04/01/2019 at 06:04:33 (UTC).

R. Acosta v. Benefits Consulting Group

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 R Acosta filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Benefits Consulting Group. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1122

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

MARILYN WARD

CHIMES INTERNATIONAL, LTD.

MARTIN LAMPNER

ALBERT BUSSONE

GARY BECKMAN

FCE BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, INC.

THE CHIMES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, INCORPORATED

CHIMES D.C. INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN

STEPHEN PORTER

Plaintiff / Appellant

R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, Secretary of Labor

Defendant / Appellees

BENEFITS CONSULTING GROUP

JEFFREY RAMSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Isidro Mariscal

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Frances Perkins Building, 200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

Katrina T. Liu

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Frances Perkins Building, 200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

Geoffrey Forney

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

170 South Independence Mall West

Philadelphia, PA 19106-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Athan Theodore Tsimpedes

Attorney at TSIMPEDES LAW FIRM

1200 New Hampshire, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER filed [1000471871] granting Motion to suspend [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:43 AM]

#7

(#7) MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta to suspend Briefing Order. Date and method of service: 03/06/2019 ecf. [1000471476] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 03/06/2019 06:08 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta to place case in abeyance.. Date and method of service: 02/11/2019 ecf. [1000455681] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/11/2019 05:21 PM]

#5

(#5) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/20/2019. Response Brief due 04/19/2019 [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by R. Alexander Acosta. [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:35 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Isidro Mariscal for R. Alexander Acosta. [1000452617] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:23 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB.. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:58 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:30 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER filed [1000471871] granting Motion to suspend [ # 7 ] Copies to all parties. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta to suspend Briefing Order. Date and method of service: 03/06/2019 ecf. [1000471476] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 03/06/2019 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by R. Alexander Acosta to place case in abeyance.. Date and method of service: 02/11/2019 ecf. [1000455681] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/11/2019 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/20/2019. Response Brief due 04/19/2019 [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DOCKETING STATEMENT by R. Alexander Acosta. [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/07/2019 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Isidro Mariscal for R. Alexander Acosta. [1000452617] [19-1122] Isidro Mariscal [Entered: 02/06/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB.. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-03315-RDB. Case manager: RSewell. [19-1122] RHS [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less