This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 06:15:38 (UTC).

Quituizaca v. Barr

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Quituizaca filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2700

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Xavier Pucha Quituizaca

Batavia, NY 14020

Respondents

Michael Ball, SDDO

Jeffrey Searls, Facility Director Buffalo Federal Detention Center

Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security

Thomas Feeley, Field Office Director for Detention Removal

William P. Barr, United States Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Xavier Pucha Quituizaca

Attorney at Buffalo Federal Detention Facility

4250 Federal Drive

Batavia, NY 14020

Respondent Attorney

Michele Yvette Frances Sarko

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls Brief due date as 11/30/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 11/30/2020, copy to pro se, FILED.[2921330] [20-2700] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:10 PM]

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

7 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls Brief due date as 11/30/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 11/30/2020, copy to pro se, FILED.[2921330] [20-2700] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls, informing Court of proposed due date 11/27/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 09/01/2020 by US mail.[2921112] [20-2700] [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jessica Mckenzie, ASSIGNED.[2919487] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/28/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 08/28/2020 by US mail.[2919386] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 08/27/2020 by US mail.[2918519] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/27/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 08/27/2020 by US mail.[2918505] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/27/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 08/27/2020 by US mail.[2918022] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/27/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2910637] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/18/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2908298] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2908295] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Michael Ball, William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley, Kevin McAleenan and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. [2908288] [20-2700] [Entered: 08/14/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jeffrey J. Searls, Facility Director, Buffalo Federal Detention Facility is a litigant

Latest cases where Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Thomas Feeley, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal, Buffalo Field Office, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant