This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:04:59 (UTC).

Quinton Harris, et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Quinton Harris filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1514

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants

The National Association of Manufacturers

Association of American Railroads

National Retail Federation

Center for Workplace Compliance

Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

Plaintiff / Appellees

Norman Mount

John Baker

Quinton Harris

Thomas Taylor

Geoffrey Miller

Scott Zinn

Defendant / Appellant

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Robert L. Schug

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Nicholas Thompson

Attorney at THE MOODY LAW FIRM

Suite 200, 500 Crawford Street

Portsmouth, VA 23705

Charles Austin Delbridge

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

James H. Kaster

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Corey Lane Stull

Attorney at ATWOOD & HOLSTEIN

575 Fallbrook Boulevard

Lincoln, NE 68521

David E. Schlesinger

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Laura Baures

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Neil D. Pederson

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Lindsey E. Krause

Attorney at NICHOLS & KASTER

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Anthony S. Petru

Attorney at HILDEBRAND & MCLEOD

4Th Floor, 350 Fank H. Ogaza Plaza

Oakland, CA 94612-2006

Jonathan E. Taylor

Attorney at GUPTA & WESSLER

Suite 312, 1900 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher R. Hedican

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1700 Farnam Street, 1500 Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Leigh Campbell Joyce

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1700 Farnam Street, 1500 Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Aaron Smith

Attorney at GIBSON & DUNN

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Allison Balus

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1700 Farnam Street, 1500 Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

David P. Kennison

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1700 Farnam Street, 1500 Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Naima Farrell

Attorney at GIBSON & DUNN

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Eugene Scalia

Attorney at GIBSON & DUNN

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.

Attorney at GIBSON & DUNN

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Scott P. Moore

Attorney at BAIRD & HOLM

1700 Farnam Street, 1500 Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4783484-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David E. Schlesinger. Brief of John Baker, Quinton Harris, Geoffrey Miller, Norman Mount, Thomas Taylor and Scott Zinn due 06/21/2019. [4783744] [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:21 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Robert L. Schug for Appellees Mr. John Baker, Mr. Quinton Harris, Mr. Geoffrey Miller, Mr. Norman Mount, Mr. Thomas Taylor and Mr. Scott Zinn w/service 03/19/2019 [4768318] [19-1514] (RS) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #1

Amicus Brief Assoc. American Railroads

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #1

Appearance Filed

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company. No Transcript[4771362] [19-1514] (THD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document #2

CovLtrAmBrFiled

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James H. Kaster for Appellees Mr. John Baker, Mr. Quinton Harris, Mr. Geoffrey Miller, Mr. Norman Mount, Mr. Thomas Taylor and Mr. Scott Zinn w/service 03/19/2019 [4768125] [19-1514] (JHK) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:48 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Rae T. Vann for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) Center for Workplace Compliance w/service 05/02/2019 [4783884] [19-1514] (RTV) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:45 PM]

Open Document #2

Appearance Filed

Open Document #1

Amicus Brief of Chamber of Commerce of USA, et al.

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/27/2019 [4771373] [19-1514] (THD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:36 PM]

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Paper copies Amicus Brief, [ # 4783880-2 ] filed by Center for Workplace Compliance 10 copies paper copies received. [4785160] [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Paper copies Amicus Brief, [ # 4782537-2 ] filed by AAR 10 copies paper copies received. [4785154] [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Rae T. Vann for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) Center for Workplace Compliance w/service 05/02/2019 [4783884] [19-1514] (RTV) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by Center for Workplace Compliance w/service 05/02/2019 , Length: 6,421 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Center for Workplace Compliance due 05/07/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4783880] [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMICUS/INTERVENOR brief of Center for Workplace Compliance (CWC) submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4783825] [19-1514] (RTV) [Entered: 05/02/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4783484-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David E. Schlesinger. Brief of John Baker, Quinton Harris, Geoffrey Miller, Norman Mount, Thomas Taylor and Scott Zinn due 06/21/2019. [4783744] [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. David E. Schlesinger for Appellees Mr. John Baker, Mr. Quinton Harris, Mr. Geoffrey Miller, Mr. Norman Mount, Mr. Thomas Taylor and Mr. Scott Zinn correcting [ # 4783484-2 ] motion filed by Attorney. [4783720] [19-1514] (DES) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • On December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under Rule 27, certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 4783484-2 ], submitted by Mr. David E. Schlesinger in 19-1514 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/02/2019 06:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Paper copies Amicus Brief, [ # 4782480-2 ] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Retail Federation and The National Association of Manufacturers 10 copies paper copies received. [4783522] [19-1514] (CMD) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by William A. Brasher for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) AAR w/service 05/01/2019 [4783513] [19-1514] (WAB) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company - Separate Appendix - w/service 03/27/2019 [4771373] [19-1514] (THD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company. No Transcript[4771362] [19-1514] (THD) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Scott P. Moore, Allison D. Balus for Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company w/service 03/21/2019 [4769532] [19-1514] (SPM) [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Robert L. Schug for Appellees Mr. John Baker, Mr. Quinton Harris, Mr. Geoffrey Miller, Mr. Norman Mount, Mr. Thomas Taylor and Mr. Scott Zinn w/service 03/19/2019 [4768318] [19-1514] (RS) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by David E. Schlesinger for Appellees Mr. John Baker, Mr. Quinton Harris, Mr. Geoffrey Miller, Mr. Norman Mount, Mr. Thomas Taylor and Mr. Scott Zinn w/service 03/19/2019 [4768129] [19-1514] (DES) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by James H. Kaster for Appellees Mr. John Baker, Mr. Quinton Harris, Mr. Geoffrey Miller, Mr. Norman Mount, Mr. Thomas Taylor and Mr. Scott Zinn w/service 03/19/2019 [4768125] [19-1514] (JHK) [Entered: 03/19/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company. - FOR CAL [4766826] [19-1514] (THD) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Thomas H. Dupree Jr. for Appellant Union Pacific Railroad Company w/service 03/14/2019 [4766781] [19-1514] (THD) [Entered: 03/14/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 04/22/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Union Pacific Railroad Company due 04/22/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766185] [19-1514] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Docketed On Transfer - 23(f). This case was tranferred from miscellaneous case number 19-8006. [4766173] [19-1514] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.