This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 06:02:05 (UTC).

Quintez Talley v. Gilmore, et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Quintez Talley filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Gilmore. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3776

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ROBERT GILMORE

ANKRAM

COMMISSIONER DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

QUINTEZ TALLEY

Labelle, PA 15450

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Timothy Mazzocca Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Cassidy L. Neal Esq.

Attorney at Matis Baum & O'Connor

912 Fort Duquesne Boulevard

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Daniel B. Mullen Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Quintez Talley

Attorney at Fayette SCI

48 Overlook Drive

Labelle, PA 15450

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#19

(#19) ORDER (Clerk) Upon further review, it appears that this appeal may be subject to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act. Insofar as the appellant has accrued three strikes in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g), the 'three strikes' provision of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), he must file a motion demonstrating imminent danger if he wishes to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant may have 21 days from the date of this Order to file a motion demonstrating imminent danger. Failure to either pay the fees or file an imminent danger motion will result in the case being dimissed without further notice 3rd Cir. LAR Misc. 107. (TMM) [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:19 PM]

Open Document #2

DC Order 11/7/19

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Ankram to Response Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/31/2019. [19-3776] (CLN) [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:36 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger greoups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be designated filer, as follows: For all parties represented by Timothy Mazzocca, Esq. or any other attorney from the Attorney General's Office, the designated filer shall be Robert D. Gilmore. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions, and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf. (TMM) [Entered: 12/05/2019 09:17 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellee Robert Gilmore to Motion for leave to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/27/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [19-3776]--[Edited 12/27/2019 by TMM] (DBM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:44 AM]

Open Document #3

DC Order 9/19/18

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Gilmore, Zaken, Leggett, McCombie, Dialesandro, Caro, Mankey, Wetzel, Burt, Conney, Dept. of Corrections. [19-3776] (DBM) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:10 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #7

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

ECF FILER: Duplicate Response filed by Appellee Robert Gilmore to Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/27/2019. [19-3776]--[Edited 12/27/2019 by TMM] (DBM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:15 PM]

Open Document #6

Standing Order

Open Document #4

DC Amended order 8/21/18

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cassidy L. Neal, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Amy Ankrom, incorrectly identified as "Ankram". [19-3776] (CLN) [Entered: 12/27/2019 08:51 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER (Clerk) Upon further review, it appears that this appeal may be subject to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act. Insofar as the appellant has accrued three strikes in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g), the 'three strikes' provision of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), he must file a motion demonstrating imminent danger if he wishes to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant may have 21 days from the date of this Order to file a motion demonstrating imminent danger. Failure to either pay the fees or file an imminent danger motion will result in the case being dimissed without further notice 3rd Cir. LAR Misc. 107. (TMM) [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Ankram to Response Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/31/2019. [19-3776] (CLN) [Entered: 12/31/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Duplicate Response filed by Appellee Robert Gilmore to Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/27/2019. [19-3776]--[Edited 12/27/2019 by TMM] (DBM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellee Robert Gilmore to Motion for leave to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/27/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [19-3776]--[Edited 12/27/2019 by TMM] (DBM) [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cassidy L. Neal, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Amy Ankrom, incorrectly identified as "Ankram". [19-3776] (CLN) [Entered: 12/27/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Gilmore, Zaken, Leggett, McCombie, Dialesandro, Caro, Mankey, Wetzel, Burt, Conney, Dept. of Corrections. [19-3776] (DBM) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Quintez Talley. (TMM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Quintez Talley. (TMM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Quintez Talley. (TMM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Quintez Talley to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 12/02/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for larger greoups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be designated filer, as follows: For all parties represented by Timothy Mazzocca, Esq. or any other attorney from the Attorney General's Office, the designated filer shall be Robert D. Gilmore. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions, and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf. (TMM) [Entered: 12/05/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 12/05/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Quintez Talley in District Court No. 2-16-cv-01318. (TMM) [Entered: 12/05/2019 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.