This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:59 (UTC).

Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sull v. Ngozika Nwaneri

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sull filed an Other lawsuit against Ngozika Nwaneri. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7067

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

Defendant / Appellant

Ngozika J. Nwaneri

Lanham, MD 20706

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Keith H. Forst

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

1300 I Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Florentina Dragulescu

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

1300 I Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Ngozika J. Nwaneri

7214 Kempton Road

Lanham, MD 20706

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1805940] for response [ # 1805939-2 ] filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:25 PM]

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2

Open Document #4

Exhibit 3

Open Document #1

Response to Motion Filed

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #6

Exhibit 5

Open Document #5

Exhibit 4

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1805935] for motion to dismiss case [ # 1805934-2 ] filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:04 PM]

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document

MOTION [1804754] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/12/2019) filed by Ngozika J. Nwaneri (Service Date: 08/30/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 76 pages. [19-7067] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:14 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1803925] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1802629-2 ]; APPELLANT and APPELLEE dispositive motions, if any, due 09/30/2019 [19-7067] [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document #1

Notice Filed

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document

STATEMENT [1802795] with Disclosure Listing filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan [Service Date: 08/19/2019 ] [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:30 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibits

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1805940] for response [ # 1805939-2 ] filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1805939] to motion [ # 1804754-2 ] filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan [Service Date: 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Length Certification: 3,167 Words. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1805935] for motion to dismiss case [ # 1805934-2 ] filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1805934] to dismiss case (Response to Motion served by hand due on 09/20/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/20/2019) filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (Service Date: 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 1,612 Words. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1804754] for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/12/2019) filed by Ngozika J. Nwaneri (Service Date: 08/30/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 76 pages. [19-7067] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1803925] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1802629-2 ]; APPELLANT and APPELLEE dispositive motions, if any, due 09/30/2019 [19-7067] [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1804745] filed by Ngozika J. Nwaneri [Service Date: 09/03/2019 ] [19-7067] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT [1802795] with Disclosure Listing filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan [Service Date: 08/19/2019 ] [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1802629] to extend time to file motion filed by Ngozika J. Nwaneri (Service Date: 08/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 11 pages. [19-7067] [Entered: 08/16/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1802624], DOCKETING STATEMENT, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, PROCEDURAL MOTIONS, STATMENT OF INTENT TO UTILIZE DEFERRED APPENDIX, STATEMENT OF ISSUES, TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT, UNDERLYING DECISIONS filed by Ngozika J. Nwaneri [Service Date: 08/16/2019 ] [19-7067] [Entered: 08/16/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1802301] filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan [Service Date: 08/15/2019 ] [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 08/15/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1802299] filed by Keith H. Forst and co-counsel Florentina Dragulescu on behalf of Appellee Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan. [19-7067] (Forst, Keith) [Entered: 08/15/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1799294] received from Illegible [signed for on 07/19/2019] for order [1797471-2] sent to Appellant Ngozika J. Nwaneri [19-7067] [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1797471] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 1003] of order [ # 1797467-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/15/2019 from Ngozika J. Nwaneri. [19-7067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1797467] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/30/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/15/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/30/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-7067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1797465] sent regarding attorney membership to Keith H. Forst for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan. Application for Admission due 08/15/2019. [19-7067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797462] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00990-CKK filed by Ngozika J. Nwaneri. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7067. [19-7067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.