Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2020 at 06:13:52 (UTC).

Quentrell Williams v. Michael Haure, et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 Quentrell Williams filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Michael Haure. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1514

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KEVIN BRUNING

KRISTI ANSTETH

PATRICK SHELLENBERGER

KAITLYN JACOBS

MICHAEL HAURE, Sheriff Deputy

BENJAMIN DOLNICK

ANGELA BOCK

Plaintiff / Appellant

QUENTRELL E. WILLIAMS

Waupun, WI 53963-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matteo Reginato

Attorney at MUNICIPAL LAW & LITIGATION GROUP, S.C.

730 N. Grand Avenue

Waukesha, WI 53186

Ryan M. Weisner

Attorney at DAVIS & KUELTHAU

111 E. Kilbourn Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202-6613

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Quentrell E. Williams

Attorney at WAUPUN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 351

Waupun, WI 53963-0000

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [10] [7080196] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:19 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams. [8] [7079364] [20-1514] (CG) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:33 PM]

Open Document

FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 05/01/2020 Order Vacating Dismissal/Recalling Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7078303-2] [7078303] [20-1514] (AP) [Entered: 05/01/2020 02:24 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER: After Quentrell Williams filed appeal no. 20-1514, the district court informed this court that it had erroneously transferred his notice of appeal to this court. As a result, this court administratively closed the appeal. Williams then filed several documents in the district court, a new notice of appeal opened as appeal no. 20-1574, and a motion to recall the mandate in 20-1514. Appeal no. 20-1574 challenged the same district court order as appeal no. 20-1514. This court ordered appellant Williams to file a supplement to his motion to recall the mandate confirming that he would like to pursue appeal no. 20-1514, and if so, whether appeal no. 20-1574 should be dismissed as duplicative. Parts of Williamss supplement are difficult to read, but the court understands him to say that he would like to pursue appeal no. 20-1514 and that appeal no. 20-1574 can be dismissed as duplicative. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion to recall the mandate is GRANTED and appeal no. 20-1514 is reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appeal no. 20-1574 is administratively CLOSED as duplicative. No appellate filing fees for appeal no. 20-1574 shall be imposed. Williams is reminded to pay the appellate filing fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in appeal no. 20-1514 by June 1, 2020. (See order for details) [ # 4 ] SCR [7] [7078295] [20-1514, 20-1574] (AP) [Entered: 05/01/2020 02:08 PM]

#6

(#6) Motion filed by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams to consider and process appeal no 20-1514 and to dismiss appeal no 20-1574 with good cause. [6] [7077824] [20-1514] (MAN) [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:24 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER re: Motion to recall the mandate. Review of the district court docket shows that Quentrell Williams filed several notices of appeal, one of which has been transmitted to this court and opened as appeal no. 20-1574. All of the filings purport to challenge the order issued by Magistrate Judge Crocker, dated March 3, 2020. Further, on April 13, 2020, the district court denied Williamss request to file an interlocutory appeal. The district court explained that the March 3 order is not a final order and that because Williams did not file a timely objection to the March 3 order, he forfeited his right to challenge the order in this court. See Flint v. City of Belvidere, 791 F.3d 764, 769 (7th Cir. 2015). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Williams shall file a supplement to his motion to recall the mandate by April 29, 2020, confirming that he would like to pursue this appeal, and if so, whether appeal no. 20-1574 should be dismissed as duplicative. [5] [7075233] SCR [20-1514] (AG) [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:54 PM]

#4

(#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams to recall the mandate. [4] [7073620] [20-1514] (CAH) [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:45 PM]

Open Document #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

#3

(#3) Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [3] [7072065] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 09:03 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: The district court erroneously transmitted a notice of appeal to this court. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is administratively CLOSED. No appellate filing fees are due for this appeal. The mandate in this appeal shall issue forthwith. SCR [2] [7072057] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:51 AM]

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [10] [7080196] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Ryan M. Weisner for Appellee Kaitlyn Jacobs has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [9] [7079714] [20-1514] (LJ) [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams. [8] [7079364] [20-1514] (CG) [Entered: 05/06/2020 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 05/01/2020 Order Vacating Dismissal/Recalling Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7078303-2] [7078303] [20-1514] (AP) [Entered: 05/01/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: After Quentrell Williams filed appeal no. 20-1514, the district court informed this court that it had erroneously transferred his notice of appeal to this court. As a result, this court administratively closed the appeal. Williams then filed several documents in the district court, a new notice of appeal opened as appeal no. 20-1574, and a motion to recall the mandate in 20-1514. Appeal no. 20-1574 challenged the same district court order as appeal no. 20-1514. This court ordered appellant Williams to file a supplement to his motion to recall the mandate confirming that he would like to pursue appeal no. 20-1514, and if so, whether appeal no. 20-1574 should be dismissed as duplicative. Parts of Williamss supplement are difficult to read, but the court understands him to say that he would like to pursue appeal no. 20-1514 and that appeal no. 20-1574 can be dismissed as duplicative. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the motion to recall the mandate is GRANTED and appeal no. 20-1514 is reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appeal no. 20-1574 is administratively CLOSED as duplicative. No appellate filing fees for appeal no. 20-1574 shall be imposed. Williams is reminded to pay the appellate filing fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in appeal no. 20-1514 by June 1, 2020. (See order for details) [ # 4 ] SCR [7] [7078295] [20-1514, 20-1574] (AP) [Entered: 05/01/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion filed by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams to consider and process appeal no 20-1514 and to dismiss appeal no 20-1574 with good cause. [6] [7077824] [20-1514] (MAN) [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re: Motion to recall the mandate. Review of the district court docket shows that Quentrell Williams filed several notices of appeal, one of which has been transmitted to this court and opened as appeal no. 20-1574. All of the filings purport to challenge the order issued by Magistrate Judge Crocker, dated March 3, 2020. Further, on April 13, 2020, the district court denied Williamss request to file an interlocutory appeal. The district court explained that the March 3 order is not a final order and that because Williams did not file a timely objection to the March 3 order, he forfeited his right to challenge the order in this court. See Flint v. City of Belvidere, 791 F.3d 764, 769 (7th Cir. 2015). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Williams shall file a supplement to his motion to recall the mandate by April 29, 2020, confirming that he would like to pursue this appeal, and if so, whether appeal no. 20-1574 should be dismissed as duplicative. [5] [7075233] SCR [20-1514] (AG) [Entered: 04/15/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Quentrell E. Williams to recall the mandate. [4] [7073620] [20-1514] (CAH) [Entered: 04/08/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/01/2020 Final Order administratively CLOSING case with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7072071-2] [7072071] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Mandate issued. No record to be returned. [3] [7072065] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: The district court erroneously transmitted a notice of appeal to this court. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is administratively CLOSED. No appellate filing fees are due for this appeal. The mandate in this appeal shall issue forthwith. SCR [2] [7072057] [20-1514] (VG) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 04/14/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Quentrell E. Williams by 04/07/2020. [1] [7071943] [20-1514] (AD) [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less