This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 06:08:08 (UTC).

Quality Door & Hardware, Inc. v. Stanley Security Solutions, In

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Quality Door Hardware, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stanley Security Solutions, In. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1438

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Quality Door & Hardware, Inc.

Defendant / Appellee

Stanley Security Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Justin N. Lite Esq.

Attorney at Lite & Russell

212 Higbie Lane

West Islip, NY 11795

Richard J. DaVolio Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard J. DaVolio, P.C.

160 Main Street

Sayville, NY 11782

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael Crowley Esq.

Attorney at Connell Foley LLP

888 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10106

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ORDER, dated 06/19/2019, setting Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc.'s brief and appendix filing date for on or before 09/03/2019, as the date selected falls on a Saturday, FILED.[2590035] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/19/2019 09:50 AM]

#36

(#36) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 08/31/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2589630] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:02 PM]

#35

(#35) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [31], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2589446] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:59 PM]

#34

(#34) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2589196] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:22 PM]

#29

(#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Stanley Security Solutions, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2586068] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:25 AM]

#28

(#28) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/16/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2584179] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:15 AM]

#24

(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, [ # 24 ], [ # 23 ], [19], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2583109] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:18 AM]

#23

(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, [ # 24 ], [ # 23 ], [19], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2583109] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:18 AM]

#22

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2581975] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:22 PM]

#10

(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2581718] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:27 PM]

7 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

7 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER, dated 06/19/2019, setting Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc.'s brief and appendix filing date for on or before 09/03/2019, as the date selected falls on a Saturday, FILED.[2590035] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/19/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification [ # 35 ], [ # 36 ], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2589772] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 08/31/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 06/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2589630] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [31], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2589446] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2589196] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#31) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 06/14/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 06/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2587091] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 29 ], [ # 17 ], [11], on behalf of Appellee Stanley Security Solutions, Inc., FILED.[2586074] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Stanley Security Solutions, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2586068] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/16/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2584179] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, [ # 24 ], [ # 23 ], [19], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2583109] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2581975] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Stanley Security Solutions, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2581842] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED.[2581718] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2581713] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Stanley Security Solutions, Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2581311] [19-1438] [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2568440] [19-1438] [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#5) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Justin N. Lite, Esq. for Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2566648] [19-1438] [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., district court receipt # ANYEDC-11489067, FILED.[2566644] [19-1438] [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 04/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2566637] [19-1438] [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Quality Door & Hardware, Inc., FILED. [2566625] [19-1438] [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stanley Security Solutions, Inc. is a litigant