This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2021 at 06:13:40 (UTC).

Quad City Patent, LLC v. Zoosk, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Quad City Patent, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zoosk, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1544

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ZOOSK, INC.

EC SERVICES CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

QUAD CITY PATENT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert L. Uriarte Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Robert Luis Uriarte Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Andrew Timothy Oliver

Attorney at Amin Turocy & Watson LLP

160 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Michael Chaocha Ting

Attorney at Amin Turocy & Watson LLP

160 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lilly M. Vega

1545 N Kellogg Street

Galesburg, IL 61401

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION of Appellee EC Services Corporation to terminate appeal through dismissal with prejudice. Cases to be terminated: 21-1574. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion).. Service: 03/02/2021 by email. [759688] [21-1544] [Andrew Oliver] [Entered: 03/02/2021 11:21 PM]

#10

(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Zoosk, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2021 by email. [759067] [21-1544] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 02/26/2021 07:31 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Zoosk, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 03/05/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [758902] [EKD] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:42 AM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Zoosk, Inc. Service: 02/23/2021 by email, US mail. [758121] [21-1544] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 9 ] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 02/23/2021 07:42 PM]

#7

(#7) MOTION of Appellee Zoosk, Inc. to terminate appeal through dismissal. Cases to be terminated: 21-1544 and 21-1574. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). Service: 02/23/2021 by clerk. [758120]--[Edited 02/24/2021 by MMA to correct relief] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 02/23/2021 07:40 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Robert L. Uriarte as counsel for Appellee Zoosk, Inc.. Service: 01/28/2021 by email. [752299] [21-1544] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 01/28/2021 12:12 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Andrew T. Oliver; Michael C. Ting as counsel for Appellee EC Services Corporation. Service: 01/27/2021 by email. [752230] [21-1544] [Andrew Oliver] [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:32 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Appellee EC Services Corporation to terminate appeal through dismissal with prejudice. Cases to be terminated: 21-1574. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion).. Service: 03/02/2021 by email. [759688] [21-1544] [Andrew Oliver] [Entered: 03/02/2021 11:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Zoosk, Inc.. Service: 02/26/2021 by email. [759067] [21-1544] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 02/26/2021 07:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellee Zoosk, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 8 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 03/05/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [758902] [EKD] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Zoosk, Inc. Service: 02/23/2021 by email, US mail. [758121] [21-1544] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 9 ] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 02/23/2021 07:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION of Appellee Zoosk, Inc. to terminate appeal through dismissal. Cases to be terminated: 21-1544 and 21-1574. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion). Service: 02/23/2021 by clerk. [758120]--[Edited 02/24/2021 by MMA to correct relief] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 02/23/2021 07:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 4 ], Doc No. [ # 5 ], ERROR: The case number on the documents is incomplete. CORRECTION: For future filings, please include all consolidated case numbers. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [753506] [EKD] [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Robert L. Uriarte as counsel for Appellee Zoosk, Inc.. Service: 01/28/2021 by email. [752299] [21-1544] [Robert Uriarte] [Entered: 01/28/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Andrew T. Oliver; Michael C. Ting as counsel for Appellee EC Services Corporation. Service: 01/27/2021 by email. [752230] [21-1544] [Andrew Oliver] [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1544 (Lead) with 21-1574 (Member Case). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [751851] [21-1544, 21-1574] [MMA] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals (21-1544 and 21-1574). Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 03/26/2021. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [751843] [21-1544, 21-1574] [MMA] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/05/2021. [749138] Fee/IFP due on 01/27/2021. Entry of Appearance due 01/27/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/27/2021. Docketing Statement due 01/27/2021. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 03/15/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 01/13/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zoosk, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where QUAD CITY PATENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EC SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant