This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2021 at 06:09:08 (UTC).

Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant

PUERTO RICO ASPHALT, LLC

Debtors

BETTERECYCLING CORPORATION

BETTEROADS ASPHALT, LLC

Appellees

ST. JAMES SECURITY, INC.

SARGEANT MARINE, INC.

ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT BANK FOR PUERTO RICO

FACSIMILE PAPER CONNECTION, INC.

BANCO SANTANDER DE PUERTO RICO

BANCO POPULAR DE PUERTO RICO

FIRST BANK PUERTO RICO, INC.

SARGEANT TRADING LIMITED

FACSIMIL PAPER CONNECTION, INC.

Interested Party

US TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Myrna L. Ruiz Olmo

Attorney at MRO Attorneys at Law, LLC

Po Box 367819

San Juan, PR 00936-7819

Debtor Attorneys

Wigberto Lugo Mender

Attorney at Lugo Mender Group LLC

100 Carr 165, Ste 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968-8052

Alexis Alberto Betancourt Vincenty

Attorney at Lugo Mender Group LLC

100 Carr 165, Ste 501

Guaynabo, PR 00968-8052

Appellee Attorneys

Alexis Fuentes-Hernandez

Attorney at Fuentes Law Offices LLC

Po Box 9022726

San Juan, PR 00902-2726

Israel Oscar Alicea-Luciano

239 Arterial Hostos Ave, Capital Center Bldg

San Juan, PR 00918

Gustavo A. Chico-Barris

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

Sonia E. Colon

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

390 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Camille N. Somoza-Castello

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

Po Box 195168

San Juan, PR 00919-5168

Sonia E. Colon-Colon

Attorney at Ferraiuoli LLC

390 N Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Ivan Garau-Gonzalez

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Carolina Velaz-Rivero

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Mauricio Oscar Muniz-Luciano

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Fausto David Godreau-Zayas

Attorney at Latimer Biaggi Rachid & Godreau LLP

Po Box 9022512

San Juan, PR 00902-2512

Rafael Antonio Gonzalez-Valiente

Attorney at Latimer Biaggi Rachid & Godreau LLP

Po Box 9022512

San Juan, PR 00902-2512

Interested Party Attorney

Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas

Attorney at US Trustees Office

Po Box 9024003

San Juan, PR 00902-4003

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 04/05/2021 for appellant Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Appendix due 04/05/2021 for appellant Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1005] (CMP) [Entered: 02/23/2021 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Ivan Garau-Gonzalez for Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc.. [21-1005] (CMP) [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney Luis C. Marini-Biaggi. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2021. [21-1005] (LCM) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney Ignacio J. Labarca-Morales. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1005] (IJL) [Entered: 02/02/2021 08:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney Carolina Velaz-Rivero. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1005] (CV) [Entered: 02/02/2021 08:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 02/08/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Ivan Garau-Gonzalez for Banco Santander De Puerto Rico, Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Economic Development Bank for Puerto Rico and First Bank Puerto Rico, Inc.. [21-1005] (CMP) [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Certificate of service dated 01/22/2021. [21-1005] (MLR) [Entered: 01/22/2021 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC filed by Attorney Myrna Ruiz-Olmo. Certificate of service dated 01/22/2021. [21-1005] (MLR) [Entered: 01/22/2021 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #72) filed by Appellant Puerto Rico Asphalt, LLC. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 01/22/2021. [21-1005] (MNH) [Entered: 01/08/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facsimil Paper Connection, Inc. is a litigant