This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/22/2019 at 06:13:30 (UTC).

PSE&G v. FERC

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 PSE G filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1091

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Public Service Electric and Gas Company

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Intervenors

Delaware Municipal Electric Corporation, Inc.

New Jersey Division of Rate Counsel

Old Dominion Electric Cooperative

New Jersey Board of Public Utilities

LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC

Maryland Public Service Commission

Easton Utilities Commission

Silver Run Electric, LLC

Delaware Public Service Commission

Delaware Division of the Public Advocate

Maryland Office of People's Counsel

PPL Electric Utilities Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Larry D. Gasteiger

Respondent Attorneys

Robert Harris Solomon Esquire

Elizabeth Evans Rylander

Intervenor Attorneys

Bhaveeta K. Mody Esquire

Thomas Lee Rudebusch

Stephen Charles Pearson

Scott Harris Strauss

Stefanie A. Brand

Kayla Grant

Adrienne Elizabeth Clair Esquire

Rebecca L. Shelton

Michael Ray Engleman

Gary James Newell

Robert A. Weishaar Jr.

Regina Ann Iorii

William F. Fields Esquire

Donald A. Kaplan Esquire

William McHarg Keyser III

Steven M. Nadel

John Longstreth

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1792387] filed granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1789289-2 ], [ # 1789262-2 ], [ # 1789260-2 ], [ # 1789244-2 ], [ # 1789186-2 ], [ # 1789128-2 ], [ # 1789052-2 ], [ # 1789024-2 ], [ # 1788904-2 ], [ # 1788535-2 ] and [ # 1786664-2 ]. [19-1091, 19-1093] [Entered: 06/12/2019 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1789984] to hold case in abeyance filed by FERC [Service Date: 05/29/2019 ] Length Certification: 257 words. [19-1091] (Rylander, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/29/2019 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1789983] filed by Elizabeth E. Rylander and co-counsel Robert H. Solomon on behalf of Respondent FERC in 19-1091, 19-1093. [19-1091, 19-1093] (Rylander, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/29/2019 01:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1789445] for motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1789258-2 ] filed by PPL Electric Utilities Corporation in 19-1093. [19-1093, 19-1091] (Longstreth, John) [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1789289] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC and Silver Run Electric, LLC [Service Date: 05/23/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by JAD] (Engleman, Michael) [Entered: 05/23/2019 07:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1789262] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Delaware Municipal Electric Corporation, Inc. [Service Date: 05/23/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by JAD] (Rudebusch, Thomas) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1789260] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by PPL Electric Utilities Corporation [Service Date: 05/23/2019 ] [19-1091]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by JAD] (Longstreth, John) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1789258] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by PPL Electric Utilities Corporation in 19-1093 Length Certification: 448 words. [19-1093, 19-1091] (Longstreth, John) [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1789244] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative [Service Date: 05/23/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093]--[Edited 05/24/2019 by JAD] (Grant, Kayla) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1789186] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Delaware Public Service Commission [Service Date: 05/23/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093]--[Edited 05/23/2019 by JAD] (Weishaar, Robert) [Entered: 05/23/2019 12:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1788904] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by The Easton Utilities Commission [Service Date: 05/22/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093] -- [Edited 05/23/2019 by JAD] (Newell, Gary) [Entered: 05/22/2019 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1788537] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Delaware Division of the Public Advocate [Service Date: 05/20/2019 ] [19-1093, 19-1091--DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD]--[Edited 05/21/2019 by AH] (Iorii, Regina) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1788535] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Delaware Division of the Public Advocate [Service Date: 05/20/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093]--[Edited 05/20/2019 by AY] (Iorii, Regina) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1786664] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by New Jersey Division of Rate Counsel [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-1091, 19-1093]--[Edited 05/08/2019 by AY] (Pearson, Stephen) [Entered: 05/08/2019 07:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1785306] filed consolidating cases 19-1093 (Consolidation started 04/30/2019) with 19-1091; directing party to file in 19-1093 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/30/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/30/2019 [19-1091, 19-1093] [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1785305] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1785303-2 ] [19-1093] [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1785068] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 05/29/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 05/29/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 05/29/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 05/29/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 05/29/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 05/29/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 06/13/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 05/29/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 05/29/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 06/13/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 06/13/2019 [19-1091] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1785062] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1785059-2 ] [19-1091] [Entered: 04/29/2019 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1785059] of a decision by federal agency filed by Public Service Electric and Gas Company [Service Date: 04/23/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1091] [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1091] [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less