This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2020 at 07:48:54 (UTC).

Prospect CCMC LLC v. CCNA/PA Assn Staff Nurses

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Prospect CCMC LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CCNA/PA Assn Staff Nurses. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1439

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CROZER CHESTER NURSES ASSOCIATION PENNSYLVANIA ASSOCIATION OF STAFF NURSES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONALS

Plaintiff / Appellant

PROSPECT CCMC LLC, DBA Crozer Chester Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Peter H. Demkovitz Esq.

Attorney at Markowitz & Richman

123 South Broad Street, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Thomas H. Kohn Esq.

Attorney at Markowitz & Richman

123 South Broad Street, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Jonathan K. Walters Esq.

Attorney at Markowitz & Richman

123 South Broad Street, Suite 2020

Philadelphia, PA 19109

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Tyson Herrold Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

2929 Arch Street, 12Th Floor, Cira Centre

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Andrew M. Grossman Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Renee M. Knudsen

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

61 #3

Mandate Letter

61 #2

Opinion

61 #1

Mandate Issued

60 #2

Notice of Judgment

60 #1

Judgment Entered

#59

(#59) NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: HARDIMAN, PHIPPS and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 9. Judge: PHIPPS Authoring. [19-1439, 19-1440] (SB) [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:13 PM]

Open Document

COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [18-1151, 18-3731, 19-1439, 19-1440, 19-1671] (TLG) [Entered: 10/31/2019 08:35 AM]

Open Document

Submit Notification for Thursday, 10/31/2019. [19-1439, 19-1440] (TLG) [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:36 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Renee M. Knudsen for Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in 19-1439, 19-1440. Certificate of Service dated 09/04/2019. Service made by Email. [19-1439, 19-1440] (RMK) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Order re: Page/Word Limits

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Order 1/28/19

Open Document #2

District Court Memorandum 1/28/19

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan Walters on behalf of Appellee(s) Crozer Chester Nurses Assoc./PASNAP. [19-1439, 19-1440] (JKW) [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew M. Grossman on behalf of Appellant(s) Prospect CCMC, LLC d/b/a Crozer-Chester Medical Center. [19-1439, 19-1440] (AMG) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:43 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER The appeals at Nos. 19-1439 & 19-1440 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The parties are advised that all-case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, filed. [19-1439, 19-1440] (CJG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:46 PM]

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MANDATE ISSUED. [19-1439, 19-1440] (SB) [Entered: 03/19/2020 07:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant. [19-1439, 19-1440] (SB) [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: HARDIMAN, PHIPPS and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 9. Judge: PHIPPS Authoring. [19-1439, 19-1440] (SB) [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketSUBMITTED on Thursday, October 31, 2019. Panel: HARDIMAN, PHIPPS and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. [19-1439, 19-1440] (TLG) [Entered: 10/31/2019 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [18-1151, 18-3731, 19-1439, 19-1440, 19-1671] (TLG) [Entered: 10/31/2019 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmit Notification for Thursday, 10/31/2019. [19-1439, 19-1440] (TLG) [Entered: 10/16/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Renee M. Knudsen for Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in 19-1439, 19-1440. Certificate of Service dated 09/04/2019. Service made by Email. [19-1439, 19-1440] (RMK) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Renee M. Knudsen on behalf of Appellant(s) Prospect CCMC, LLC d/b/a Crozer-Chester Medical Center. [19-1439, 19-1440] (RMK) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Jonathan K. Walters, Esq. for Appellee Crozer Chester Nurses Association Pennsylvania Association of Staff Nurses and Allied Professionals in 19-1439, 19-1440. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1439, 19-1440] (JKW) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCalendared for Thursday, 10/31/2019. Calendar Clerk: TLG. [19-1439, 19-1440] (TLG) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in 19-1439, 19-1440 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1439, 19-1440] (AMG) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Crozer Chester Nurses Association Pennsylvania Association of Staff Nurses and Allied Professionals in 19-1439, 19-1440, filed. [19-1439, 19-1440] (JKW) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in 19-1439, 19-1440, received. [19-1439, 19-1440] (AMG) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in 19-1439, 19-1440, filed. [19-1439, 19-1440] (AMG) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in 19-1439, 19-1440, filed. [19-1439, 19-1440] (AMG) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan Walters on behalf of Appellee(s) Crozer Chester Nurses Assoc./PASNAP. [19-1439, 19-1440] (JKW) [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew M. Grossman on behalf of Appellant(s) Prospect CCMC, LLC d/b/a Crozer-Chester Medical Center. [19-1439, 19-1440] (AMG) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER The appeals at Nos. 19-1439 & 19-1440 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The parties are advised that all-case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, filed. [19-1439, 19-1440] (CJG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Prospect CCMC LLC in District Court No. 2-18-mc-00174. (CJG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less