This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/26/2022 at 06:13:07 (UTC).

Promptu Systems Corporation v. Comcast Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Promptu Systems Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Comcast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1939

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PROMPTU SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Defendant / Appellees

COMCAST CORPORATION

COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jacob Adam Schroeder

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

3300 Hillview Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304

J. Michael Jakes

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Christopher Blackford

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

901 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Benjamin Schlesinger

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ajay S. Krishnan Esq.

710 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark Andrew Perry

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

2001 M Street Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Joshua Halpern

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Ian Anthony Moore

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for J. Michael Jakes; Jacob A. Schroeder; Christopher T. Blackford; Benjamin R. Schlesinger as counsel for Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/07/2022 by email. [859638] [22-1939] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/07/2022 01:45 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/07/2022 by email. [859644] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/07/2022 01:59 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/07/2022 by email. [859646] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/07/2022 02:01 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation, Entry of Appearance [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/14/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [859682] [ALK] [Entered: 07/07/2022 03:00 PM]

#6

(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for J. Michael Jakes; Jacob A. Schroeder; Christopher T. Blackford; Benjamin R. Schlesinger as counsel for Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860159] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/11/2022 11:03 AM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Mark A. Perry; Josh Halpern; Ian Moore as counsel for Appellees Comcast Cable Communications, LLC and Comcast Corporation. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860191] [22-1939] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:38 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860192] [22-1939] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:39 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860194] [22-1939] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:40 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation to extend the time to 09/26/2022 to file brief. Service: 07/18/2022 by email. [861639] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/18/2022 04:44 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. The opening brief is due 09/26/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [861729] [ALK] [Entered: 07/19/2022 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation to extend the time to 09/26/2022 to file brief. Service: 07/18/2022 by email. [861639] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/18/2022 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860194] [22-1939] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860192] [22-1939] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Mark A. Perry; Josh Halpern; Ian Moore as counsel for Appellees Comcast Cable Communications, LLC and Comcast Corporation. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860191] [22-1939] [Mark Perry] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for J. Michael Jakes; Jacob A. Schroeder; Christopher T. Blackford; Benjamin R. Schlesinger as counsel for Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/11/2022 by email. [860159] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/11/2022 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation, Entry of Appearance [ # 2 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/14/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [859682] [ALK] [Entered: 07/07/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/07/2022 by email. [859646] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/07/2022 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/07/2022 by email. [859644] [22-1939] [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/07/2022 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for J. Michael Jakes; Jacob A. Schroeder; Christopher T. Blackford; Benjamin R. Schlesinger as counsel for Appellant Promptu Systems Corporation. Service: 07/07/2022 by email. [859638] [22-1939] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ]. [Jacob Schroeder] [Entered: 07/07/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/21/2022. [857473] Entry of Appearance is due on 07/11/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/11/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 07/11/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 08/26/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 06/27/2022 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROMPTU SYSTEMS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ajay Krishnan