This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/11/2019 at 06:04:14 (UTC).

Project Veritas Action Fund v. Rollins

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Project Veritas Action Fund filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Rollins. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1586

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Plaintiff / Appellee

PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Appellant

RACHAEL SPLAINE ROLLINS, in her Official Capacity as District Attorney for Suffolk County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin T. Barr

Attorney at Statecraft PLLC

444 N Michigan Ave, Ste 1200

Chicago, IL 60611

Daniel J. Kelly

Attorney at McCarter & English LLP

265 Franklin St, Ste 1200

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Stephen Ralph Klein

Attorney at Statecraft PLLC

1629 K St Nw, Ste 300

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew P. Landry

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Eric A. Haskell

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Randall E. Ravitz

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1 Ashburton Pl

Boston, MA 02108-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Information Sheet

Open Document #1

Briefing Schedule

Open Document #3

Information Sheet

Open Document #2

Briefing Schedule

Open Document #1

Consolidation Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-APPEAL briefing schedule set pursuant to F.R.A.P. 28.1. Principal Brief and Appendix due 08/21/2019 for appellant/cross-appellee Rachael S. Rollins. Principal/Responsive Brief due 09/27/2019 for appellee/cross-appellant Project Veritas Action Fund. Response brief due 09/27/2019 for appellees K. Eric Martin and Rene Perez. Response/Reply Brief due 11/04/2019 for appellant/cross-appellee Rachael S. Rollins. Reply Brief due 11/25/2019 for appellee Project Veritas Action Fund. [19-1586, 19-1629, 19-1640] (KC) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: The parties' joint motion requesting consolidation and other relief is granted as follows: (1) Appeal Nos. 19-1586, 19-1640, and 19-1629 are hereby consolidated for the purposes of briefing and oral argument. (2) Rachael Rollins, in her official capacity as District Attorney for Suffolk County, is designated as the appellant in all three appeals. (3) The parties' proposed briefing schedule is adopted and the requested briefing enlargements are granted, as set forth in the separate briefing schedule and information sheet. [19-1586, 19-1640, 19-1629] (KC) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases, and to set briefing schedule filed by Appellant Rachael Splaine Rollins in 19-1640, Appellee Rachael Splaine Rollins in 19-1586. Certificate of service dated 07/05/2019. [19-1640, 19-1586] (EAH) [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 07/11/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Daniel J. Kelly for Project Veritas Action Fund. [19-1586] (KC) [Entered: 06/27/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Rachael Splaine Rollins filed by Attorney Eric A. Haskell. Certificate of service dated 06/26/2019. [19-1586] (EAH) [Entered: 06/26/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Project Veritas Action Fund filed by Attorney Stephen R. Klein. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1586] (SRK) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Project Veritas Action Fund filed by Attorney Benjamin Barr. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1586] (BTB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Project Veritas Action Fund indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1586] (BTB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Project Veritas Action Fund. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1586] (BTB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Project Veritas Action Fund. Certificate of service dated 06/25/2019. [19-1586] (BTB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #145) filed by Appellant Project Veritas Action Fund. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 06/26/2019. [19-1586] (KC) [Entered: 06/12/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Project Veritas Action Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric A. Haskell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew P. Landry