This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 06:02:49 (UTC).

Progressive Northern Insurance Company v. Donald Ladue

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Progressive Northern Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Donald Ladue. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1680

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellee

PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellant

DONALD LADUE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeremy Ladue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Alfred Johnston Cox

Attorney at GALLIVAN, WHITE & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 7368

Columbia, SC 29202

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

John Robert Murphy

Attorney at MURPHY & GRANTLAND, PA

P. O. Box 6648

Columbia, SC 29260

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Bert Glenn Utsey III

Attorney at CLAWSON FARGNOLI UTSEY, LLC

706 Orleans Road

Charleston, SC 29407

Rhame Berley Cannon Jr.

Attorney at RIESEN DURANT LLC

613 Long Point Road

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rhame Berley Cannon, Jr. for Donald Ladue. [1000992976] [21-1680] Rhame Cannon [Entered: 07/27/2021 03:27 PM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 09/08/2021. Response brief due 10/08/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000988250] [21-1680] RHS [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:34 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION by Donald Ladue to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/08/2021.. Date and method of service: 07/19/2021 ecf. [1000987839] [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:40 AM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000975863] [21-1680] Alfred Cox [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:01 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Johnston Cox for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. [1000975861] [21-1680] Alfred Cox [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:00 PM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [21-1680] CB [Entered: 06/28/2021 02:07 PM]

#9

(#9) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 07/01/2021 from Alfred Johnston Cox, filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 07/01/2021. [21-1680] TW [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:58 PM]

#8

(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/09/2021. Response Brief due 09/07/2021. [21-1680] TW [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:55 PM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Donald Ladue. [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:44 AM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald Ladue. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000974908] [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:42 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bert G. Utsey, III for Donald Ladue. [1000974906] [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:40 AM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000973399] [21-1680] John Murphy [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:56 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Progressive Northern Insurance Company. [1000973397] [21-1680] John Murphy [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:55 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:20-cv-03068-DCN. [21-1680] RHS [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:26 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-03068-DCN. Case manager: RSewell. [21-1680] RHS [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:19 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rhame Berley Cannon, Jr. for Donald Ladue. [1000992976] [21-1680] Rhame Cannon [Entered: 07/27/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 09/08/2021. Response brief due 10/08/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000988250] [21-1680] RHS [Entered: 07/19/2021 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Donald Ladue to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/08/2021.. Date and method of service: 07/19/2021 ecf. [1000987839] [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000975863] [21-1680] Alfred Cox [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Johnston Cox for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. [1000975861] [21-1680] Alfred Cox [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption. [21-1680] CB [Entered: 06/28/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 07/01/2021 from Alfred Johnston Cox, filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company on 07/01/2021. [21-1680] TW [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/09/2021. Response Brief due 09/07/2021. [21-1680] TW [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Donald Ladue. [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald Ladue. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000974908] [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bert G. Utsey, III for Donald Ladue. [1000974906] [21-1680] Bert Utsey [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000973399] [21-1680] John Murphy [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Progressive Northern Insurance Company. [1000973397] [21-1680] John Murphy [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:20-cv-03068-DCN. [21-1680] RHS [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-03068-DCN. Case manager: RSewell. [21-1680] RHS [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bert Glenn Utsey, III