This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 22:42:20 (UTC).

Processed Egg Products Anti, et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Processed Egg Products Anti was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1088

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOLDBERG & SOLOVY FOODS INC

SENSORYEFFECTS FLAVOR CO, DBA SensoryEffects Flavor Systems

SOMERSET INDUSTRIES

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES LP

UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS INC

UNITED EGG PRODUCERS

OHIO FRESH EGGS LLC

HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA INC

NATIONAL FOOD CORP

DAYBREAK FOODS INC

NUCAL FOODS INC

CAL-MAINE FOODS INC

MICHAEL FOODS INC

R.W. SAUDER INC

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

ROSE ACRE FARMS INC

MIDWEST POULTRY SERVICES LP

UNITED STATES EGG MARKETERS INC

UNITED EGG PRODUCERS

OHIO FRESH EGGS LLC

HILLANDALE FARMS OF PA INC

DAYBREAK FOODS INC

NUCAL FOODS INC

CAL-MAINE FOODS INC

MICHAEL FOODS INC

R.W. SAUDER INC

Plaintiff / Appellants

EBY-BROWN CO LLC

T.K. RIBBINGS FAMILY RESTAURANT

JOHN A. LISCIANDRO, DBA Lisciandro's Restaurant

KARETASFOODS INC

Amicus Curiae

NATIONAL COUNCIL OF FARMER COOPERATIVES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Ryan M. Hurley Esq.

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jan P. Levine Esq.

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robin P. Sumner Esq.

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Sarah V. Geiger Esq.

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp

One East 4Th Street, Suite 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Joseph M. Callow Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp

One East 4Th Street, Suite 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Christopher E. Ondeck Esq.

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 600 South

Washington, DC 20004

Jason Takenouchi Esq.

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres

101 California Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

William L. Greene Esq.

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 2300

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Carrie C. Mahan Esq.

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges

2001 M Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Julia Chapman Esq.

Attorney at Dechert

2929 Arch Street, 18Th Floor, Cira Centre

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Steven E. Bizar Esq.

Attorney at Dechert

2929 Arch Street, 18Th Floor, Cira Centre

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Christine C. Levin Esq.

Attorney at Dechert

2929 Arch Street, 18Th Floor, Cira Centre

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Jay L. Levine Esq.

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris & Arthur

2020 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Jetta C. Sandin Esq.

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris & Arthur

2020 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen D. Susman Esq.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Stephen R. Neuwirth Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Mindee J. Reuben Esq.

Attorney at Lite DePalma Greenberg

1835 Market Street, Suite 2700

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Kathleen M. Sullivan Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Michael D. Hausfeld Esq.

Attorney at Hausfeld

1700 K Street, N.W., Suite 650

Washington, DC 20006

Ronald J. Aranoff Esq.

Attorney at Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch

500 Fifth Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10110

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

District Court Judgment

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document #2

District Court Order dated 121418

Open Document #3

Districct Court Memorandum dared 121418

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document #7

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #6

Case Caption

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven E. Bizar on behalf of Appellee(s) R.W. Sauder, Inc.. [19-1088] (SEB) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:52 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julia Chapman on behalf of Appellee(s) R.W. Sauder, Inc.. [19-1088] (JC) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:56 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph M. Callow, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Ohio Fresh Eggs, LLC. [19-1088] (JMC) [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:20 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jay L. Levine on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1088] (JLL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 05:39 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Donald M. Barnes on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1088] (JCS) [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:36 AM]

#114

RESTRICTED

#113

RESTRICTED

#112

(#112) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Steven E. Bizar, Esq. for Appellee R.W. Sauder Inc in 19-1088 Letter to the Court regarding participation in appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 01/03/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-1188, 19-1088] (SEB) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:36 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion by Appellants for leave to file Volumes 4-7 of Joint Appendix under seal is referred to the merits panel. The Clerk will hold Volumes 4 through 7 of the joint appendix provisionally under seal pending a ruling by the Court. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EMA) [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:34 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 11/05/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 11/05/2019 01:56 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leah A. Mintz on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc..--[Edited 11/01/2019 by PDB] (LAM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 06:57 PM]

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • (#115) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq. for Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 03/26/2020, [19-1088] (KMS) [Entered: 01/15/2020 09:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan, Esq. for Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant. [19-1088] (KMS) [Entered: 01/10/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Counsel is unavailable from March 4-18, April 7-18, 2020, May 28-29, 2020, July 9, 2020, July 29-30, 2020, September 18 and 21, 2020, September 28, 2020 and October 2-9, 2020.. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Steven E. Bizar, Esq. for Appellee R.W. Sauder Inc in 19-1088 Letter to the Court regarding participation in appeal.. Certificate of Service dated 01/03/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-1188, 19-1088] (SEB) [Entered: 01/03/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion by Appellants for leave to file Volumes 4-7 of Joint Appendix under seal is referred to the merits panel. The Clerk will hold Volumes 4 through 7 of the joint appendix provisionally under seal pending a ruling by the Court. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EMA) [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Attorney Jay L. Levine, Esq. for Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 01/21/2020, 01/22/2020, 01/23/2020, 01/24/2020, [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 11/11/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188 - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. [19-1088, 19-1188] (RM) [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1088, Appellant Rose Acre Farms Inc in 19-1188. Certificate of Service dated 11/05/2019 by ECF. [19-1088, 19-1188] (JLL) [Entered: 11/05/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leah A. Mintz on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc..--[Edited 11/01/2019 by PDB] (LAM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Addendum containing identical certification received from Appellant/Cross-Appellees Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in 19-1088, 19-1188. [19-1088, 19-1188] (EAF) [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen M. Sullivan on behalf of Appellant(s) T.K. Ribbing's Family Restaurant, LLC, John A. Lisciandro d/b/a Lisciandro's Restaurant, Eby-Brown Company LLC, and Karetas Foods, Inc., on behalf of certified class of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. [19-1088] (KMS) [Entered: 01/22/2019 06:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jetta C. Sandin on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1088] (JCS) [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Donald M. Barnes on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1088] (JCS) [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jay L. Levine on behalf of Appellee(s) Rose Acre Farms, Inc.. [19-1088] (JLL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph M. Callow, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Ohio Fresh Eggs, LLC. [19-1088] (JMC) [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 01/14/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 01/15/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julia Chapman on behalf of Appellee(s) R.W. Sauder, Inc.. [19-1088] (JC) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven E. Bizar on behalf of Appellee(s) R.W. Sauder, Inc.. [19-1088] (SEB) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Eby-Brown Co LLC, KaretasFoods Inc, John A. Lisciandro and T.K. Ribbings Family Restaurant in District Court No. 2-08-md-02002. (PDB) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.