This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2020 at 06:02:28 (UTC).

Priscilla Everette-Oates v. Lolita Chapman

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Priscilla Everette-Oates filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lolita Chapman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1093

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUARTHUR OATES

Defendants

GREGORY MCLEOD, Director, North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation, in his individual capacity and in his official capacity

NORTH CAROLINA STATE AUDITOR

NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF STATE TREASURER

NORTH CAROLINA LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMISSION

DOES 1-100

GWENDOLYN KNIGHT, in her individual capacity and in her official capacity

ANN HOWELL, in her individual capacity and in her official capacity

NORTH CAROLINA STATE BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS

BARRY LONG

Defendant / Appellees

SBI AGENT LOLITA CHAPMAN, in her individual capacity

SHARON EDMUNDSON, in her individual capacity

BETH WOOD, in her individual capacity

T. VANCE HOLLOMAN, in his individual capacity

ROBIN HAMMOND, in her individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

PRISCILLA EVERETTE-OATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Tammera Sudderth Hill Esq.

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Amar Majmundar

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Bryan Grant Nichols

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

114 West Edenton Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

Brian David Rabinovitz

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Jeremy David Lindsley

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Daniel Snipes Johnson

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Samuel John Randall IV

Attorney at RANDALL & STUMP, PLLC

2125 Southend Drive

Charlotte, NC 28203

Adam Cabral Bonner

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BONNER & BONNER

475 Gate Five Road

Sausalito, CA 94965

Charles Adams Bonner

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BONNER & BONNER

475 Gate Five Road

Sausalito, CA 94965

Stephen Bergstein II

Attorney at BERGSTEIN & ULLRICH, LLP

5 Paradies Lane

New Paltz, NY 12561

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. CABRAL BONNER for Priscilla Everette-Oates. [1000701276] [20-1093] Adam Bonner [Entered: 03/12/2020 04:13 PM]

#20

(#20) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by CHARLES A. BONNER for Priscilla Everette-Oates. [1000701269] [20-1093] Charles Bonner [Entered: 03/12/2020 04:07 PM]

#19

(#19) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/23/2020. Response brief due 06/05/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000690526] [20-1093] KH [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:47 PM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Lolita Chapman, Sharon Edmundson, Robin Hammond, T. Vance Holloman and Beth Wood. [1000682009] [20-1093] Amar Majmundar [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:48 PM]

#17

(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T. Vance Holloman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682004] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:46 PM]

#16

(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robin Hammond. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682003] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:45 PM]

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharon Edmundson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682000] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:44 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for T. Vance Holloman, Robin Hammond and Sharon Edmundson. [1000681995] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:42 PM]

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lolita Chapman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000681414] [20-1093] Tammera Hill [Entered: 02/12/2020 07:23 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bryan G. Nichols for Lolita Chapman. [1000680569] [20-1093] Bryan Nichols [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:32 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tammera S. Hill for Lolita Chapman. [1000680486] [20-1093] Tammera Hill [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:40 AM]

#7

(#7) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/23/2020. Response Brief due 04/21/2020. [20-1093] KH [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:10 AM]

#6

(#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Priscilla Everette-Oates. [20-1093] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:26 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Priscilla Everette-Oates. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000680016] [20-1093] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:25 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen Bergstein for Priscilla Everette-Oates. [1000680013] [20-1093] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:24 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:16-cv-00623-FL. Mailed to: Jeremy David Lindsley, Charles Adams Bonner, Adam Cabral Bonner. [20-1093] KH [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:48 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:16-cv-00623-FL. Mailed to: Jeremy David Lindsley, Charles Adams Bonner, Adam Cabral Bonner. [20-1093] KH [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:48 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. CABRAL BONNER for Priscilla Everette-Oates. [1000701276] [20-1093] Adam Bonner [Entered: 03/12/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by CHARLES A. BONNER for Priscilla Everette-Oates. [1000701269] [20-1093] Charles Bonner [Entered: 03/12/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/23/2020. Response brief due 06/05/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000690526] [20-1093] KH [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Lolita Chapman, Sharon Edmundson, Robin Hammond, T. Vance Holloman and Beth Wood. [1000682009] [20-1093] Amar Majmundar [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T. Vance Holloman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682004] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robin Hammond. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682003] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharon Edmundson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000682000] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for T. Vance Holloman, Robin Hammond and Sharon Edmundson. [1000681995] [20-1093] Brian Rabinovitz [Entered: 02/12/2020 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lolita Chapman. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000681414] [20-1093] Tammera Hill [Entered: 02/12/2020 07:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beth Wood. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000681361] [20-1093] Daniel Johnson [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1093] LHP [Entered: 02/11/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bryan G. Nichols for Lolita Chapman. [1000680569] [20-1093] Bryan Nichols [Entered: 02/11/2020 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tammera S. Hill for Lolita Chapman. [1000680486] [20-1093] Tammera Hill [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/23/2020. Response Brief due 04/21/2020. [20-1093] KH [Entered: 02/11/2020 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Priscilla Everette-Oates. [20-1093] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Priscilla Everette-Oates for Not applicable. There were no transcribed proceedings.. [20-1093]--[Edited 02/11/2020 by KH] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Priscilla Everette-Oates. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000680016] [20-1093] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen Bergstein for Priscilla Everette-Oates. [1000680013] [20-1093] Stephen Bergstein [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:16-cv-00623-FL. Mailed to: Jeremy David Lindsley, Charles Adams Bonner, Adam Cabral Bonner. [20-1093] KH [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:16-cv-00623-FL. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1093] KH [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less