This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2021 at 05:12:50 (UTC).

Precision Planting, LLC v. Deere & Company

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Precision Planting, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Deere Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1587

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

AGCO CORP.

PRECISION PLANTING, LLC

Appellee

DEERE & COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Grant K. Rowan

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Appellee Attorney

Jay I. Alexander Esq.

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/22/2021. [752059] Entry of Appearance is due 02/10/2021. Certificate of Interest is due 02/10/2021. Docketing Statement is due 02/10/2021. Certified List is due 03/08/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 01/27/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRECISION PLANTING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AGCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Deere & Company is a litigant