This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/07/2022 at 06:11:23 (UTC).

Port of Corpus v. Port of Corpus

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Port of Corpus filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Port of Corpus. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-40124

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas

Defendant / Appellants

Port of Corpus Christi L.P.

Kenneth Berry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ashley McKeand Kleber Esq.

Macey Reasoner Stokes

Travis Lenti Gray Esq.

Gabriel David Kaim

Earnest William Wotring

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Shelby Arthur Jordan

Ben C. Broocks

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P.. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 05/31/2022 for Appellee Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:16 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion to file brief out of time filed by Appellants Port of Corpus Christi L.P. and Mr. Kenneth Berry [ # 9833295-2 ] [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:11 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #2

Appellants' Opening Brief

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document #3

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #2

Unfiled Document

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40124] (Ben C. Broocks ) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40124] (Shelby Arthur Jordan ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:57 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Ashley McKeand Kleber, Esq. for Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40124] (Ashley McKeand Kleber ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:22 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40124] (Travis Lenti Gray ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:25 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40124] (Macey Reasoner Stokes ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:22 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9793284-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:39 PM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. [22-40124] (ABT) [Entered: 03/08/2022 10:21 AM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P.. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 05/31/2022 for Appellee Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to file brief out of time filed by Appellants Port of Corpus Christi L.P. and Mr. Kenneth Berry [ # 9833295-2 ] [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Berry [ # 9831418-2 ] Date of service: 04/27/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Broocks, Jordan; Attorney for Appellees: Gray, Kaim, Kleber, Stokes, Wotring [22-40124] (Ben C. Broocks ) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file brief out of time [9833295-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 04/27/2022 [22-40124] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. for leave to file brief out of time [9833295-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 04/27/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Broocks, Jordan; Attorney for Appellees: Gray, Kaim, Kleber, Stokes, Wotring [22-40124] (Ben C. Broocks ) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appellant's brief and appendix received from Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. because it is filed out of time and there should be no appendix attached to the brief. [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 04/26/2022 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied [22-40124] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require a corrected case caption. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 05/09/2022 for Appellants Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. [22-40124] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Kenneth Berry. Date of service: 04/25/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Broocks, Jordan; Attorney for Appellees: Gray, Kaim, Kleber, Stokes, Wotring [22-40124] (Ben C. Broocks ) [Entered: 04/25/2022 11:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER denying Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Port of Corpus Christi L.P. and Mr. Kenneth Berry [ # 9805351-3 ] [ # 9805351-2 ] [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 04/06/2022 08:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas [9813881-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. [ # 9805351-2 ], Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. [ # 9805351-3 ] Date of Service: 04/01/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Broocks, Jordan; Attorney for Appellees: Gray, Kaim, Kleber, Stokes, Wotring. [22-40124] (Travis Lenti Gray ) [Entered: 04/01/2022 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the Motion for expedited ruling on motion filed by Appellants Port of Corpus Christi L.P. and Mr. Kenneth Berry in 22-40124 [ # 9805351-2 ], Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Port of Corpus Christi L.P. and Mr. Kenneth Berry in 22-40124 [ # 9805351-3 ] Response/Opposition due on 04/01/2022. [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for expedited ruling on motion [ # 9805351-2 ], Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9805351-3 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. Date of Service: 03/23/2022 [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/24/2022 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40124] (Ben C. Broocks ) [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Shelby Arthur Jordan for Appellant Kenneth Berry in 22-40124, Attorney Shelby Arthur Jordan for Appellant Port of Corpus Christi L.P. in 22-40124 [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/14/2022 08:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40124] (Shelby Arthur Jordan ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Macey Reasoner Stokes, Travis Lenti Gray for party(s) Appellee Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, in case 22-40124, by Attorney Ashley McKeand Kleber for Appellee Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas in 22-40124 [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Ashley McKeand Kleber, Esq. for Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40124] (Ashley McKeand Kleber ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 10:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-40124] (Travis Lenti Gray ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-40124] (Macey Reasoner Stokes ) [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:22-CV-30. Electronic ROA due on 03/24/2022. [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9793284-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-40124] (SDH) [Entered: 03/09/2022 01:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Kenneth Berry and Port of Corpus Christi L.P. [22-40124] (ABT) [Entered: 03/08/2022 10:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less