This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/27/2021 at 05:43:47 (UTC).

Port Maintenance Group, Inc. v. Dragan Spanjol, et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Port Maintenance Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Dragan Spanjol. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-70365

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PORT MAINTENANCE GROUP, INC.

Respondents

DRAGAN SPANJOL

TOTAL TERMINALS, INC.

DIRECTOR, OFFICE OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION PROGRAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John T. Marin

Attorney at Laughlin, Falbo, Levy & Moresi, LLP

600 B Street, Suite 2300

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorneys

Jeffrey Winter

Attorney at Law Office of Jeffrey Winter

750 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

James P. Aleccia

Attorney at Aleccia, Conner & Socha

1 World Trade Center #1840

Long Beach, CA 90831

Mark A. Reinhalter

Attorney at LABR - U.S. Department of Labor

200 Constitution Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20210

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Petition for Review

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Petitioner Port Maintenance Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/26/2021. Petitioner brief due 05/10/2021 for Port Maintenance Group, Inc.. Respondent brief due 06/09/2021 for Director, Office of Workers' Compensation Programs, Dragan Spanjol and Total Terminals, Inc.. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12009826] (JMR) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOTAL TERMINALS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Director Office of Workers' Compensation Programs, United States Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T Marin