This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/12/2021 at 06:14:08 (UTC).

Pollyanna Burns, et al v. School Svc Emp Union Local 284, et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Pollyanna Burns filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against School Svc Emp Union Local 284. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3052

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Pollyanna Burns

Rhonda Tomoson

Diane Gooding

Defendant / Appellees

School Service Employees Union Local 284

Independent School District No. 191

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Dickey

Attorney at UPPER MIDWEST LAW CENTER

Suite 300, 8421 Wayzata Boulevard

Golden Valley, MN 55426

Douglas Seaton

Attorney at UPPER MIDWEST LAW CENTER

Suite 300, 8421 Wayzata Boulevard

Golden Valley, MN 55426

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brendan D. Cummins

Attorney at CUMMINS & CUMMINS

Suite 1245, 920 Second Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at ALTSHULER & BERZON

Suite 300, 177 Post Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

Patrick Casey Pitts

Attorney at ALTSHULER & BERZON

Suite 300, 177 Post Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

Kari Marie Dahlin

Attorney at ARTHUR & CHAPMAN

500 Young Quinlan Building, 81 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Sally Jean Ferguson

Attorney at ARTHUR & CHAPMAN

500 Young Quinlan Building, 81 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Douglas P. Seaton for Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson w/service 09/22/2021 [5079762] [21-3052] (DS) [Entered: 09/22/2021 06:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James V. F. Dickey for Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson w/service 09/29/2021 [5081768] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:50 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson. No Transcript[5081773] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:51 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/29/2021 [5081837] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 12:31 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson. w/service 09/29/2021 [5082033] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:58 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson - w/service 09/30/2021. [5082398] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:43 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to hold case in abeyance pending the decision in 21-1366, Hoekman, et al. v. Education Minnesota, et al., filed by Attorney Mr. James Dickey for Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Rhonda Tomoson and Diane Gooding w/service 10/19/2021 [5088834] [21-3052]--[Edited to add correct relief 10/19/2021 by HAG] (JD) [Entered: 10/19/2021 11:58 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The [ # 5088834-2 ] joint motion to hold this appeal in abeyance pending the decision in Hoekman v. Education Minnesota, No. 21-1366 is granted. [5089002] [21-3052] (HAG) [Entered: 10/19/2021 03:16 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: The [ # 5088834-2 ] joint motion to hold this appeal in abeyance pending the decision in Hoekman v. Education Minnesota, No. 21-1366 is granted. [5089002] [21-3052] (HAG) [Entered: 10/19/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to hold case in abeyance pending the decision in 21-1366, Hoekman, et al. v. Education Minnesota, et al., filed by Attorney Mr. James Dickey for Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Rhonda Tomoson and Diane Gooding w/service 10/19/2021 [5088834] [21-3052]--[Edited to add correct relief 10/19/2021 by HAG] (JD) [Entered: 10/19/2021 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketLETTER from Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson regarding Notice of Similar Cases (Local Rule 34B). w/service 10/18/2021. **LOCKED-Counsel refiled as a motion** [5088594] [21-3052]--[Edited to indicate locked 10/19/2021 by HAG] (JD) [Entered: 10/18/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson - w/service 09/30/2021. [5082398] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/30/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson. w/service 09/29/2021 [5082033] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/29/2021 [5081837] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson. No Transcript[5081773] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by James V. F. Dickey for Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson w/service 09/29/2021 [5081768] [21-3052] (JD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Douglas P. Seaton for Appellants Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson w/service 09/22/2021 [5079762] [21-3052] (DS) [Entered: 09/22/2021 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kari M. Dahlin for Appellee Independent School District No. 191 w/service 09/14/2021 [5076577] [21-3052] (KMD) [Entered: 09/14/2021 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Sally J. Ferguson for Appellee Independent School District No. 191 w/service 09/14/2021 [5076438] [21-3052] (SJF) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by P. Casey Pitts for Appellee School Service Employees Union Local 284 w/service 09/14/2021 [5076377] [21-3052] (PCP) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee School Service Employees Union Local 284. - FOR CAL [5076371] [21-3052] (SAK) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Scott A. Kronland for Appellee School Service Employees Union Local 284 w/service 09/14/2021 [5076369] [21-3052] (SAK) [Entered: 09/14/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Brendan D. Cummins for Appellee School Service Employees Union Local 284 w/service 09/14/2021 [5076314] [21-3052] (BDC) [Entered: 09/14/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 10/25/2021. Appendix due 11/02/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Pollyanna Burns, Diane Gooding and Rhonda Tomoson due 11/02/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5075934] [21-3052] (ASL) [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum Opinion and Order of 8/12/2021, Judgment of 8/13/2021, and docket entries, [5075930] [21-3052] (ASL) [Entered: 09/13/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5075919] [21-3052] (ASL) [Entered: 09/13/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sally J Ferguson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan D. Cummins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Kronland