This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/14/2021 at 06:18:12 (UTC).

Police and Fire Retirement Sys v. AxoGen, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Police and Fire Retirement Sys filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against AxoGen, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11246

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellees

KAREN ZADEREJ

MARK GOLD

GREGORY G. FREITAG

GUIDO NEELS

AXOGEN, INC.

PETER J. MARIANI

ROBERT J. RUDELIUS

AMY WENDELL

LEERINK PARTNERS LLC

JAMIE M. GROOMS

JEFFERIES LLC

JMP SECURITIES LLC

WILLIAM BLAIR & COMPANY, L.L.C.

Plaintiff / Appellant

POLICE AND FIRE RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE CITY OF DETROIT, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leo W. Desmond

Attorney at Desmond Law Firm

5070 Hwy A1A Ste D

Vero Beach, FL 32963

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Elan Abraham Gershoni

Attorney at DLA Piper, LLP (US)

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2500

Miami, FL 33131

Fredrick H. L. McClure

Attorney at Trenam Law

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

Caryn G. Schechtman

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1104

Marc Alan Silverman

Attorney at Frank Weinberg & Black, PA

7805 Sw 6Th Ct

Plantation, FL 33324

Daniel P. Roeser

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

620 8Th Ave

New York, NY 10018-1618

Katherine L. Dacey

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

100 Northern Ave

Boston, MA 02210

Brian E. Pastuszenski

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

620 8Th Ave

New York, NY 10018-1618

Amy Lea Drushal

Attorney at Trenam Law

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

Brian Pastuszenski

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

620 8Th Ave

New York, NY 10018-1618

Katherine Dacey

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP

100 Northern Ave

Boston, MA 02210

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Adam David Warden

Attorney at Saxena White, PA

7777 Glades Rd Ste 300

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Jonathan D. Park

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

485 Lexington Ave Fl 29

New York, NY 10017

Jay W. Eisenhofer

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

485 Lexington Ave Fl 29

New York, NY 10017

John C. Kairis

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

123 Justison St

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lester R. Hooker

Attorney at Saxena White, PA

7777 Glades Rd Ste 300

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Daniel L. Berger

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

485 Lexington Ave Fl 29

New York, NY 10017-2631

Joseph Edward White III

Attorney at Saxena White, PA

7777 Glades Rd Ste 300

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Rebecca A. Musarra

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

123 Justison St

Wilmington, DE 19801

Daniel Berger

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

485 Lexington Ave Fl 29

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

Ex. 2 - Declaration of Remi Hovsepian, sworn to May 14, 2021

Open Document #3

Ex. 1 - Letter from Court, dated April 15, 2021, filed in M.D. Fla.

Open Document #2

Declaration of Jonathan D. Park in Support of Motion to Reinstate Appeal

Open Document #1

Motion to Reinstate Appeal

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #119

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/20/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Daniel P. Roeser for Appellees Jefferies LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Leerink Partners LLC and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11246] (ECF: Daniel Roeser) [Entered: 05/19/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Amanda E. Reagan for Appellees AxoGen, Inc., Gregory G. Freitag, Mark Gold, Jamie M. Grooms, Peter J. Mariani, Guido Neels, Robert J. Rudelius, Amy Wendell and Karen Zaderej. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11246] (ECF: Amanda Reagan) [Entered: 05/18/2021 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/28/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/18/2021 07:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9386835-2 ] [Entered: 05/17/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9386835-1] [21-11246] (ECF: Daniel Berger) [Entered: 05/14/2021 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 05/14/2021 as to Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 05/13/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Kairis for Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. [21-11246] (ECF: John Kairis) [Entered: 05/10/2021 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan D. Park for Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. [21-11246] (ECF: Jonathan Park) [Entered: 04/30/2021 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amy Lea Drushal for Leerink Partners LLC. [21-11246] (ECF: Amy Drushal) [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam David Warden for Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. [21-11246] (ECF: Adam Warden) [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan D. Park for Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11246] (ECF: Jonathan Park) [Entered: 04/28/2021 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Park, Jonathan D. for Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit [21-11246] (ECF: Jonathan Park) [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amanda E. Reagan for Appellees, Axogen, Inc., Karen Zaderej, Peter J. Mariani, Gregory G. Freitag, Jamie M. Grooms, Robert J. Rudelius, Mark Gold, Guido Neels, and Amy Wendell [21-11246] (ECF: Amanda Reagan) [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Bill Jones, Filer: Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 04/27/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 09/11/2019 , Pre-Trial Proceedings 12/04/2019. [Entered: 04/27/2021 07:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Mr. Jonathan D. Park is GRANTED by clerk. [9368893-2] [Entered: 04/26/2021 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketMOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan D. Park for Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. [9368893-1] [Entered: 04/26/2021 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit on 04/14/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2021 as to Appellant Police and Fire Retirement System of the City of Detroit. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/13/2021 as to Appellees AxoGen, Inc. and Leerink Partners LLC [Entered: 04/16/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where William Blair & Company L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where JMP SECURITIES LLC is a litigant