This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/02/2021 at 06:08:20 (UTC).

Plumbers & Pipefitters Local v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Plumbers Pipefitters Local filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10335

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORPORATION

GLAXOSMITHKLINE PLC

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

GLAXOSMITHKLINE (AMERICA) INC.

ZYDUS PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.

NOSTRUM LABORATORIES INC.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS OF NEW YORK, LLC

APOTEX CORP.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.

SANOFI US SERVICES, INC.

AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC

MYLAN, INC.

GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. USA

AURO HEALTH LLC

ACTAVIS MID ATLANTIC, LLC

SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LIMITED, formerly known as Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.

PFIZER, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION 630 WELFARE FUND

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Julia Zousmer

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

110 N Wacker Dr Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Mark S. Cheffo

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Ave Fl 22

New York, NY 10010

Eric Francis Gladbach

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Justin D. Rodriguez

Attorney at Atkinson Baker & Rodriguez, PC

201 3Rd St Nw Ste 1850

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Richard J. Sapp

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode, PC

700 Walnut St Ste 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309-3899

Douglas A. Baker

Attorney at Atkinson Baker & Rodriguez, PC

201 3Rd St Nw Ste 1850

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Madison Kitchens

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Cheryl A. Sabnis

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

101 2Nd St Ste 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Frances M. Haas

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode PC

One Greatamerica Plaza, 625 1St St Se Ste 400

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Jessica Perry Corley

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory A. Ruehlmann

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Elizabeth Francesca Lindquist

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1515 Wynkoop St Ste 800

Denver, CO 80202

James G. Powers

Attorney at McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC

1601 Dodge St Ste 3700

Omaha, NE 68102

Mark Alan Sentenac

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Patrick M. Fahey

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin, LLP

1 Constitution Plz Fl 19

Hartford, CT 06103

James Robert Sheppard III

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1100 Louisiana St Ste 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Chad R. Fears

Attorney at Evans Fears & Schuttert, LLP

2300 W Sahara Ave Ste 950

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Francisco Armada

Attorney at Broad & Cassel

2 S Biscayne Blvd Fl 21

Miami, FL 33131

Thomas J. Sheehan

Attorney at Phillips Lytle, LLP

125 Main St 1 Canalside

Buffalo, NY 14203

Will W. Sachse

Attorney at Dechert, LLP

2929 Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19104

52 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #6

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #5

Order on Motion to Dismiss doc#2512

Open Document #4

Order on Motion to Dismiss doc#2532

Open Document #3

Order on Motion to Dismiss doc#2516

Open Document #2

Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim doc#2513

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Nichole Mabry Mooney is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9346665-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney Thomas Patrick Wert for Appellees Zydus Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Ltd. in 21-10335. [Entered: 03/31/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketOver the phone 10 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Jay P. Lefkowitz for all Appellees in 21-10305. Reply to response is now due on 04/15/2021 as to all Appellees. [21-10305, 21-10306, 21-10335]--[Edited 03/31/2021 by TLS] Counsel phoned to advise the extension request pertains to all appellees. [Entered: 03/31/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Nichole Mabry Mooney for Appellees Cadila Healthcare Ltd. and Zydus Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. Motion is Unopposed [9346665-1] [21-10335] (ECF: Nichole Mooney) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [ # 9322752-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [21-10335] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [21-10335] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noah Heinz for Plaintiff-Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund [21-10335] (ECF: Noah Heinz) [Entered: 03/25/2021 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nichole M. Mooney for Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Limited [21-10335] (ECF: Nichole Mooney) [Entered: 03/15/2021 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry M. Henry for Defendant-Appellee Apotex Corp. [21-10335] (ECF: Terry Henry) [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket17-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. Updated Awaiting Response to Motion. Due on 03/29/2021 as to Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket14-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. Appellants brief due on 03/29/2021 as to Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. Appendix due on 04/05/2021 as to Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel A.H. Horton for sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc. [21-10335] (ECF: Rachel Horton) [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ilana H. Eisenstein for sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc. [21-10335] (ECF: Ilana Eisenstein) [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark J. Dearman for Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [21-10335] (ECF: Mark Dearman) [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/15/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/12/2021 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [21-10335] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-10335] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley Keller for Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [21-10335] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 01/28/2021 as to Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund on 01/28/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/16/2021 as to Appellant Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Union 630 Welfare Fund. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/01/2021 as to Appellee GlaxoSmithKline LLC [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE) is a litigant

Latest cases where Plumbers and Pipefitters Local No. 525 Pension & Retirement Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Nostrum Laboratories Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Auro Health, LLC is a litigant