Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 06:08:51 (UTC).

Plumbers and Steamfitters, et al v. Carroll Plumbing, et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Plumbers and Steamfitters filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Carroll Plumbing. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2284

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33 Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof

Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33 Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof

Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33 Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof

Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof

Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof

Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof

Defendant / Appellees

Consolidated Heating and Cooling, LLC

Carroll Plumbing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael G. McNally

Attorney at FOX & ROTHSCHILD

Campbell Mithun Tower, Suite 2000, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3338

Wesley Timothy Graham

Attorney at DUNCAN & GREEN

380 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

Colleen McGarry

Attorney at FOX & ROTHSCHILD

Campbell Mithun Tower, Suite 2000, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Elizabeth A. Patton

Attorney at FOX & ROTHSCHILD

Campbell Mithun Tower, Suite 2000, 222 S. Ninth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3338

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Erika Lauren Bauer

Attorney at BELIN & MCCORMICK

2000 Financial Center, 666 Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

Kelsey J. Knowles

Attorney at BELIN & MCCORMICK

2000 Financial Center, 666 Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

Jeffrey A. Krausman

Attorney at DICKINSON & MACKAMAN

1600 Hub Tower, 699 Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

Melissa A. Schilling

Attorney at DICKINSON & MACKAMAN

1600 Hub Tower, 699 Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50309-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [ # 4943891-2 ], Court Record, Doc No. [4943887-2], filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof [4944801] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 08/12/2020 03:40 PM]

Open Document

Paper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4942347-2 ] filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached Paper brief deficiency due 08/17/2020. (No certificate of service) [4943891] [20-2284] (MDS) [Entered: 08/10/2020 05:21 PM]

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof , w/service 08/05/2020 [4942349] [20-2284] (CRJ) [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:51 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof. w/service 08/05/2020 , Length: 5,571 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof due 08/10/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Carroll Plumbing and Consolidated Heating and Cooling due on 09/04/2020 [4942347] [20-2284] (CRJ) [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:50 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof - Joint Appendix - w/service 07/09/2020 [4932058] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Colleen McGarry for Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof w/service 07/09/2020 [4931852] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:15 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Consolidated Heating and Cooling. - FOR CAL [4929581] [20-2284] (KJK) [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:54 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Plumbers and Steamfitters and Plumbers and Steamfitters. - FOR CAL [4929405] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/01/2020 09:57 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth A. Patton for Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Plumbers and Steamfitters and Plumbers and Steamfitters w/service 06/30/2020 [4929239] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 06/30/2020 04:35 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Wesley T. Graham for Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Plumbers and Steamfitters and Plumbers and Steamfitters w/service 06/26/2020 [4927978] [20-2284] (WTG) [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kelsey J. Knowles for Appellee Consolidated Heating and Cooling w/service 06/26/2020 [4927923] [20-2284] (KJK) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:20 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/04/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Plumbers and Steamfitters due 08/04/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4927419] [20-2284] (CAH) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:26 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, judgment 5/16/20, order 5/27/20. [4927418] [20-2284] (CAH) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:25 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4927416] [20-2284] (CAH) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:21 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [ # 4943891-2 ], Court Record, Doc No. [4943887-2], filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof [4944801] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 08/12/2020 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4942347-2 ] filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached Paper brief deficiency due 08/17/2020. (No certificate of service) [4943891] [20-2284] (MDS) [Entered: 08/10/2020 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketRECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies. [4943887] [20-2284] (MDS) [Entered: 08/10/2020 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof , w/service 08/05/2020 [4942349] [20-2284] (CRJ) [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof. w/service 08/05/2020 , Length: 5,571 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof due 08/10/2020 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Carroll Plumbing and Consolidated Heating and Cooling due on 09/04/2020 [4942347] [20-2284] (CRJ) [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4942316] [20-2284]--[Edited 08/05/2020 by CRJ. This entry was edited to correct the type of addendum submitted.] (EAP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4942314] [20-2284]--[Edited 08/05/2020 by CRJ. This entry was edited to correct the type of brief submitted.] (EAP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4942105] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4942103] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 08/04/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof - Joint Appendix - w/service 07/09/2020 [4932058] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof - w/service 07/09/2020. [4932052] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Colleen McGarry for Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Education Fund and the Trustees Thereof, Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Health and Welfare Fund and the Trustees Thereof and Plumbers and Steamfitters, Local Union No. 33, Retirement Trust and the Trustees Thereof w/service 07/09/2020 [4931852] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Consolidated Heating and Cooling. - FOR CAL [4929581] [20-2284] (KJK) [Entered: 07/01/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Plumbers and Steamfitters and Plumbers and Steamfitters. - FOR CAL [4929405] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 07/01/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth A. Patton for Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Plumbers and Steamfitters and Plumbers and Steamfitters w/service 06/30/2020 [4929239] [20-2284] (EAP) [Entered: 06/30/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Wesley T. Graham for Appellants Plumbers and Steamfitters, Plumbers and Steamfitters and Plumbers and Steamfitters w/service 06/26/2020 [4927978] [20-2284] (WTG) [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kelsey J. Knowles for Appellee Consolidated Heating and Cooling w/service 06/26/2020 [4927923] [20-2284] (KJK) [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/04/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Plumbers and Steamfitters due 08/04/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4927419] [20-2284] (CAH) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, judgment 5/16/20, order 5/27/20. [4927418] [20-2284] (CAH) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4927416] [20-2284] (CAH) [Entered: 06/25/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa A. Schilling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey J Knowles