This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 06:11:32 (UTC).

Plantation Open MRI LLC v. Infinity Auto Insurance Co.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Plantation Open MRI LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Infinity Auto Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11032

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PLANTATION OPEN MRI LLC, agent of Jorge Hidalgo agent of Gloria Diaz agent of Shawn Thomas

Defendant / Appellee

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jaime Eileen Martin

Attorney at Vernis Bowling of Broward

713 Ne 17Th Terrace

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Jose P. Font

Attorney at Font & Nelson, PLLC

200 S Andrews Ave Ste 501

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Douglas H. Stein

Attorney at Law Offices of Douglas H. Stein, PA

1200 Brickell Ave Ste 2000

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Garrett A. Tozier

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen, LLP

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33607

Victoria San Pedro Madani

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131-4333

Rachel M. LaMontagne

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131-4333

Suzanne Labrit

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen, LLP

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-10414 filed by KMPR. Motion is Unopposed. [8732518-1] [19-11032] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:50 PM]

Open Document #3

DC Order Doc 72

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Plantation Open MRI LLC. [19-11032] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:13 PM]

Open Document #4

Civil Appeal Docketed Doc 15

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Plantation Open MRI, LLC [19-11032] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 03/26/2019 07:50 AM]

Open Document #6

Civil Appeal Docketed

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Suzanne Labrit for KMPR. [19-11032] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document #7

DC Order Doc 13

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Garrett A. Tozier for Infinity/KMPR [19-11032] (ECF: Garrett Tozier) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11032] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:10 PM]

Open Document #5

DC Order Doc 13

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Plantation Open MRI,LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11032] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:11 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-10414 filed by KMPR. Motion is Unopposed. [8732518-1] [19-11032] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 03/29/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Plantation Open MRI LLC. [19-11032] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Plantation Open MRI,LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11032] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Plantation Open MRI, LLC [19-11032] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 03/26/2019 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Garrett A. Tozier for Infinity/KMPR [19-11032] (ECF: Garrett Tozier) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11032] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Suzanne Labrit for KMPR. [19-11032] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Plantation Open MRI LLC on 03/18/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/29/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/02/2019 as to Appellant Plantation Open MRI LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/16/2019 as to Appellee Infinity Auto Insurance Company [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.