This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 06:32:57 (UTC).

Planck v. Saul

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Planck filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1714

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Andrew Saul, Social Security Commissioner

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jason S. Planck

Schenectady, NY 12304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven David Clymer

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

P.O. Box 7198, 100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

Jessica Tucker Esq.

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

625 John F. Kennedy Federal Building, 15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jason S. Planck

208 Jackson Avenue, Apt. B

Schenectady, NY 12304

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER, dated 06/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/08/2020 unless Appellant Jason S. Planck submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2864053] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:35 AM]

#16

(#16) ORDER, dated 06/15/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/07/2020 unless Appellant Jason S. Planck submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2862497] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/15/2020 05:06 PM]

#15

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER, dated 06/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/08/2020 unless Appellant Jason S. Planck submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2864053] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER, dated 06/15/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/07/2020 unless Appellant Jason S. Planck submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2862497] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/15/2020 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Notice of Appearance As Substitute Counsel, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by US mail.[2859465] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY, Jessica Tucker, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Maria Fragassi Santangelo, SUBSTITUTED.[2859451] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by US mail. [2859325] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Notice of Appearance for Substitute Counsel, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 06/05/2020 by US mail.[2858009] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/09/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Maria Fragassi Santangelo, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Steven David Clymer, SUBSTITUTED.[2855522] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 06/05/2020 by US mail. [2855497] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2852779] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2852777] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2852773] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER, dated 04/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2852771] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/02/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jason S. Planck, FILED. [2852639] [20-1714] [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less