Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2020 at 06:10:27 (UTC).

Pizarro-Correa v. PR Internal Revenue Department, et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Pizarro-Correa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PR Internal Revenue Department. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1388

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PUERTO RICO INTERNAL REVENUE DEPARTMENT, a/k/a Departamento de Hacienda Puerto Rico

ALBERTO CARDONA-CRESPO

COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO

Plaintiff / Appellant

LUZ PIZARRO-CORREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Idza Diaz-Rivera

Attorney at PR Department of Justice

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Michel Mir-Martinez

Attorney at PR Department of Justice

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Susana I. Penagaricano Brown

Attorney at PR Department of Justice

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Carlos Lugo-Fiol

Po Box 260150

San Juan, PR 00926

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Humberto Felix Cobo-Estrella

Attorney at Cobo Estrella Law Office

Po Box 366451

San Juan, PR 00936-6451

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 06/02/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Michel Mir-Martinez for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Internal Revenue Department and Alberto Cardona-Crespo. [20-1388] (RMK) [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:51 PM]

Open Document

NOTICEfiled by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa. Certificate of service dated 05/05/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/05/2020 11:10 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:20 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:18 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa filed by Attorney Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:17 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Alberto Cardona-Crespo, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Internal Revenue Department filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 04/28/2020. [20-1388] (CL) [Entered: 04/28/2020 04:54 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit Order indicating Stay has expired under PROMESA

Open Document #1

Motion/Notice In Compliance

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered: This is an appeal from the dismissal of plaintiff's employment discrimination complaint. On May 3, 2017, the Commonwealth filed a petition under Title III of PROMESA, 48 U.S.C. 2161, et seq., for adjustment of its debts. Under section 2161(a), the bankruptcy stay provisions of 11 U.S.C. 362 and 922 are incorporated into PROMESA. In light of the Commonwealth's PROMESA filing, we direct the parties to show cause within twenty-one days of the date of this order whether the automatic stay applies to this appeal. The parties are directed to state with specificity the reasoning behind their conclusion one way or the other. [20-1388] (RMK) [Entered: 04/09/2020 09:55 AM]

Open Document #3

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Case Opening Notice

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 06/02/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Michel Mir-Martinez for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Internal Revenue Department and Alberto Cardona-Crespo. [20-1388] (RMK) [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICEfiled by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa. Certificate of service dated 05/05/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/05/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa filed by Attorney Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellees Alberto Cardona-Crespo, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Internal Revenue Department to order allowing appeal to go forward [ # 6330983-2 ], response [ # 6334959-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1388] (CL) [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Alberto Cardona-Crespo, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Internal Revenue Department filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 04/28/2020. [20-1388] (CL) [Entered: 04/28/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa to order allowing appeal to go forward [ # 6330983-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/28/2020. [20-1388] (HFC) [Entered: 04/28/2020 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER to Show Cause entered: This is an appeal from the dismissal of plaintiff's employment discrimination complaint. On May 3, 2017, the Commonwealth filed a petition under Title III of PROMESA, 48 U.S.C. 2161, et seq., for adjustment of its debts. Under section 2161(a), the bankruptcy stay provisions of 11 U.S.C. 362 and 922 are incorporated into PROMESA. In light of the Commonwealth's PROMESA filing, we direct the parties to show cause within twenty-one days of the date of this order whether the automatic stay applies to this appeal. The parties are directed to state with specificity the reasoning behind their conclusion one way or the other. [20-1388] (RMK) [Entered: 04/09/2020 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #96) filed by Appellant Luz Pizarro-Correa. Docketing Statement, Appearance form, and Transcript Report/Order form due 05/18/2020. [20-1388]. (RMK) [Entered: 04/03/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella