This case was last updated from PACER on 07/23/2019 at 21:53:32 (UTC).

Pinto Lugo, et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Pinto Lugo filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1181

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Debtors

EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO

PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)

PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Appellee

PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY

Petitioner / Appellants

UNION INDEPENDIENTE DE EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ACUEDUCTOS Y ALCANTARILLADOS, (UIA)

MANUEL NATAL-ALBELO

UNION DE EMPLEADOS PROFESIONALES INDEPENDIENTES, (UEPI)

UNION DE EMPLEADOS DE OFICINA COMERCIO Y RAMAS ANEXAS, PUERTOS, (UEOCRA)

UNION INSULAR DE TRABAJADORES INDUSTRIALES Y CONSTRUCCIONES ELECTRICAS INC., (UITICE)

UNION NACIONAL DE EDUCADORES Y TRABAJADORES DE LA EDUCACION, (UNETE)

MOVIMIENTO DE CONCERTACION CIUDADANA INC., (VAMOS)

UNION DE EMPLEADOS DE OFICINA Y PROFESIONALES DE LA AUTORIDAD DE EDIFICIOS PUBLICOS, (UEOGAEP)

ASOCIACION DE INNSPECTORES DE JUEGOS DE AZAR, (AIJA)

RENE PINTO-LUGO

Interested Parties

WHITEBOX MULTI-STRATEGY PARTNERS, L.P.

AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION

AUTONOMOUS MUNICIPALITY OF PONCE, (AMP)

Debtor / Appellees

PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina

COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO

Trustee

MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS

San Juan, PR 00901-1922

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor and Debtor / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin J. Perra

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Timothy W. Mungovan

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1 International Pl

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Paul V. Possinger

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

70 W Madison, Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60602

Gregg M. Mashberg

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Arturo Diaz-Angueira

Attorney at Cancio Nadal Rivera & Diaz PSC

Po Box 364966

San Juan, PR 00936-4966

Joseph P. Davis III

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1 International Pl, Ste 2000

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Peter D. Doyle

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Scott Rutsky

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Ricardo Burgos-Vargas

Po Box 8448

San Juan, PR 00910-0488

Michael A. Firestein

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2029 Century Park East, Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lucia Chapman

Attorney at Luskin Stern & Eisler LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036

Debtor and Appellee Attorneys

Joseph P. Davis III

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1 International Pl, Ste 2000

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Daniel L. Cantor

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-0000

Matthew P. Kremer

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-0000

Interested Party Attorneys

Raul S. Mariani-Franco

Po Box 9022864

San Juan, PR 00902-2864

Charlie M. Hernandez

Attorney at Charlie Hernandez Law Offices

206 Tetuan St, Ste 701

Old San Juan, PR 00901-1839

Other Attorneys

Jose J. Santos Mimoso

Attorney at Sepulvado & Maldonado PSC

304 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 990

San Juan, PR 00918

Luke A. Sizemore

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 5Th Ave, Ste 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christopher Neil Gray

Attorney at Clifford Chance US LLP

31 W 52Nd St

New York, NY 10019-6131

Albeniz Couret-Fuentes

Attorney at Sepulvado & Maldonado PSC

304 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 990

San Juan, PR 00918

72 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file sur-reply brief filed by Appellants Rene Pinto-Lugo, Manuel Natal-Albelo, VAMOS, UEOGAEP, UITICE, UIA, UEOCRA, UEPI, UNETE and AIJA. Sur-reply brief due 07/26/2019 for appellants. [19-1181] (MH) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants AIJA, Manuel Natal-Albelo, Rene Pinto-Lugo, UEOCRA, UEOGAEP, UEPI, UIA, UITICE, UNETE and VAMOS. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1181] (ROM) [Entered: 07/22/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Sur-Reply filed by Appellants Rene Pinto-Lugo, Manuel Natal-Albelo, VAMOS, UEOGAEP, UITICE, UIA, UEOCRA, UEPI, UNETE and AIJA. Sur-Reply brief due 07/22/2019 for appellants. [19-1181] (CP) [Entered: 07/12/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants AIJA, Manuel Natal-Albelo, Rene Pinto-Lugo, UEOCRA, UEOGAEP, UEPI, UIA, UITICE, UNETE and VAMOS. Certificate of service dated 07/10/2019. [19-1181] (ROM) [Entered: 07/10/2019 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge: Appellants' Motion Requesting Leave to File Sur-Reply is granted. The Sur-Reply shall be filed within ten days of the date of this order. [19-1181] (KC) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply Brief filed by Appellants AIJA, Manuel Natal-Albelo, Rene Pinto-Lugo, UEOCRA, UEOGAEP, UEPI, UIA, UITICE, UNETE and VAMOS. Certificate of service dated 06/14/2019. [19-1181] (ROM) [Entered: 06/14/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation and AAFAF to response to dismiss or for summary disposition [ # 6254481-2 ], response [ # 6254481-3 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/29/2019. [19-1181] (BSR) [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file reply filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB, AAFAF and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. Reply to appellants' response to appellees' motion to dismiss due 05/29/2019. No further extension of this deadline should be expected. [19-1181, 19-1182] (KC) [Entered: 05/17/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file reply filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation and AAFAF in 19-1181, 19-1182. Certificate of service dated 05/16/2019. [19-1181, 19-1182] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BSR) [Entered: 05/16/2019 08:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to motion to dismiss case [ # 6246559-2 ] filed by Appellants AIJA, Manuel Natal-Albelo, Rene Pinto-Lugo, UEOCRA, UEOGAEP, UEPI, UIA, UITICE, UNETE and VAMOS. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1181] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (ROM) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (JER) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (MDH) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Levitan. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (JWL) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Lary A. Rappaport. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (LAR) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (MJB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (SLR) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Michael A. Firestein. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (MAF) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 03/07/2019. [19-1181] (TWM) [Entered: 03/07/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Gabriel Hertzberg for Not Party Ambac Assurance Corporation in 19-1181, 19-1182. [19-1181, 19-1182] (KC) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #5155) filed by Appellants AIJA, VAMOS, Manuel Natal-Albelo, Rene Pinto-Lugo, UIA, UITICE, UNETE, UEPI, UEOCRA and UEOGAEP. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 03/08/2019. [19-1181] (KC) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITEBOX MULTI-STRATEGY PARTNERS, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO is a litigant