This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/04/2021 at 06:12:13 (UTC).

Pink Floyd (1987) Limited v. BMJLUSAFashion

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Pink Floyd 1987 Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against BMJLUSAFashion. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2237

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

PINK FLOYD (1987) LIMITED

Defendant / Appellant

BMJLUSAFASHION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Keith A. Vogt

111 W. Jackson Boulevard

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tao Liu

Attorney at GLACIER LAW PLLC

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Tianyu Ju

Attorney at GLACIER LAW PLLC

200 E. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #1

Final Order with Mandate

7 #2

Mandate

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

Open Document #2

Mandate

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/03/2021 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7176846-2] [7176846] [21-2237] (AD) [Entered: 08/03/2021 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [7] [7176843] [21-2237] (AD) [Entered: 08/03/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion filed by Appellant BMJLUSAFashion to dismiss case. [6] [7176697] [21-2237] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/07/2021 for BMJLUSAFashion. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/07/2021 for Pink Floyd (1987) Limited. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/28/2021 for Appellant BMJLUSAFashion. JNS [7173924] [21-2237] (CG) [Entered: 07/20/2021 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday August 6, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS [4] [7173922] [21-2237] (CG) [Entered: 07/20/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tianyu Ju for Appellant BMJLUSAFashion. [3] [7172258] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2237]--[Edited 07/13/2021 by FP to reflect that atty. Ju is added to the docket.] (Ju, Tianyu) [Entered: 07/12/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant BMJLUSAFashion. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7172253] [21-2237] (Liu, Tao) [Entered: 07/12/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 07/20/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant BMJLUSAFashion by 07/09/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/16/2021 for BMJLUSAFashion. [1] [7171346] [21-2237] (AD) [Entered: 07/07/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINK FLOYD (1987) LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tianyu Ju

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tao Liu