This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 06:06:10 (UTC).

Pinedo v. United States, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Pinedo filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4004

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FABIAN MALDONADO PINEDO

Defendant / Appellant

JON MARTINSON, JR.

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric W. Hinckley

Attorney at Zachary Lowe

6028 South Ridgeline Drive, Suite 200

Ogden, UT 84405

Zachary Lowe

6028 South Ridgeline Drive, Suite 200

Ogden, UT 84405

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Erik Strindberg

Attorney at Strindberg & Scholnick

675 East 2100 South, Suite 350

Salt Lake City, UT 84106

Cameron S. Platt

Attorney at Strindberg & Scholnick

675 East 2100 South, Suite 350

Salt Lake City, UT 84106

Jonathan K. Thorne

Attorney at Strindberg & Scholnick

675 East 2100 South, Suite 350

Salt Lake City, UT 84106

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Christopher Levi Martin

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

P.O. Box 668

Cheyenne, WY 82003-0668

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10627351] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These appeals are consolidated for the procedural purposes of briefing, submission and record. The order entered on 02/14/19 setting a briefing deadline in appeal no. 19-4004 is vacated (see order for new briefing instructions). Served on 02/15/2019. [19-4004, 19-4013] [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:59 PM]

Open Document

[10621904] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/25/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/06/2019 for Jon Martinson Jr. [19-4004] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:01 AM]

Open Document

[10620559] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher Levi Martin for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4004] [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:05 PM]

Open Document

[10619695] Entry of appearance filed by Cameron S. Platt, Erik Strindberg and Jonathan K. Thorne for Jon Martinson, Jr.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4004] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document

[10619660] Notice received from Mr. Jon Martinson, Jr. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4004] ES [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:19 AM]

Open Document

[10619656] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Jon Martinson, Jr.. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4004] ES [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:17 AM]

Open Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #2

Preliminary Record

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10627351] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These appeals are consolidated for the procedural purposes of briefing, submission and record. The order entered on 02/14/19 setting a briefing deadline in appeal no. 19-4004 is vacated (see order for new briefing instructions). Served on 02/15/2019. [19-4004, 19-4013] [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket - Vacated per 2/15/19 order [10627017] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 03/20/2019 for Jon Martinson Jr. [19-4004] [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket by MLB - A new appeal will be opened based off this preliminary record. [10624235] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: 02/04/19 corrected notice of appeal. [19-4004] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10621904] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/25/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/06/2019 for Jon Martinson Jr. [19-4004] [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10620559] Entry of appearance filed by Christopher Levi Martin for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4004] [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • [10620471] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher Levi Martin for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4004] --[Edited 01/22/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] CLM [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • [10619740] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/24/2019 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-4004] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10619695] Entry of appearance filed by Cameron S. Platt, Erik Strindberg and Jonathan K. Thorne for Jon Martinson, Jr.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4004] [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10619660] Notice received from Mr. Jon Martinson, Jr. that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-4004] ES [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • [10619659] Entry of appearance submitted by Erik Strindberg, Jonathan K. Thorne, Cameron Platt for Appellant Mr. Jon Martinson, Jr. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4004] --[Edited 01/17/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/17/19] ES [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10619656] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Jon Martinson, Jr.. Served on 01/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4004] ES [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10616599] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/04/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 01/22/2019 for Jon Martinson Jr. Notice of appearance also due on 01/22/2019 for United States of America [19-4004] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less