This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 06:03:00 (UTC).

Pine Bluff School District v. Ace American Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Pine Bluff School District filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ace American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2594

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

Chubb Insurance Company

Plaintiff / Appellant

Pine Bluff School District

Defendant / Appellee

Ace American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David A. Hodges Sr.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID HODGES

Suite 500, 212 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Wall

Attorney at LLOYD & GRAY

2501 20Th Place, S.

Birmingham, AL 35223

David B. Vandergriff

Attorney at QUATTLEBAUM & GROOMS

Suite 1900, 111 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

Stephen Errol Whitehead

Attorney at LLOYD & GRAY

2501 20Th Place, S.

Birmingham, AL 35223

Jennifer W. Wall

Attorney at LLOYD & GRAY

2501 20Th Place, S.

Birmingham, AL 35223

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Pine Bluff School District , w/service 09/26/2019 [4835100] [19-2594] (AMT) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Pine Bluff School District. w/service 09/26/2019 , Length: 8,646 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Pine Bluff School District due 10/01/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Ace American Insurance Company due on 10/28/2019 [4835099] [19-2594] (AMT) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:21 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4822975-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David A. Hodges, Sr. [4824347] Brief of Pine Bluff School District due 10/09/2019. Appendix due on 10/09/2019 [4824347] [19-2594] (AMT) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:04 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/22/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Hodges, Sr. for Appellant Pine Bluff School District w/service 08/26/2019. [4822975] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:22 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Ace American Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [4819951] [19-2594] (DBV) [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:46 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Pine Bluff School District - w/service 08/09/2019. [4817411] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:59 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Pine Bluff School District - Separate Appendix - w/service 08/09/2019 [4817407] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:57 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Pine Bluff School District. No Transcript[4817405] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:54 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by DAVID B VANDERGRIFF for Appellee Ace American Insurance Company w/service 08/06/2019 [4815977] [19-2594] (DBV) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:07 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by David A. Hodges for Appellant Pine Bluff School District w/service 08/06/2019 [4815952] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:44 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/09/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Pine Bluff School District due 09/09/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4813717] [19-2594] (TMF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/26/19, docket entries, Opinion & Order 7/12/19, Judgment 7/12/19. [4813715] [19-2594] (TMF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:11 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4813712] [19-2594] (TMF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:07 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Pine Bluff School District , w/service 09/26/2019 [4835100] [19-2594] (AMT) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Pine Bluff School District. w/service 09/26/2019 , Length: 8,646 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Pine Bluff School District due 10/01/2019 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Ace American Insurance Company due on 10/28/2019 [4835099] [19-2594] (AMT) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT brief of Pine Bluff School District submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4834674] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Pine Bluff School District. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4834671] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [ # 4822975-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David A. Hodges, Sr. [4824347] Brief of Pine Bluff School District due 10/09/2019. Appendix due on 10/09/2019 [4824347] [19-2594] (AMT) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/22/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Hodges, Sr. for Appellant Pine Bluff School District w/service 08/26/2019. [4822975] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Ace American Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [4819951] [19-2594] (DBV) [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Pine Bluff School District - w/service 08/09/2019. [4817411] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Pine Bluff School District - Separate Appendix - w/service 08/09/2019 [4817407] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Pine Bluff School District. No Transcript[4817405] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by DAVID B VANDERGRIFF for Appellee Ace American Insurance Company w/service 08/06/2019 [4815977] [19-2594] (DBV) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by David A. Hodges for Appellant Pine Bluff School District w/service 08/06/2019 [4815952] [19-2594] (DAH) [Entered: 08/06/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/09/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Pine Bluff School District due 09/09/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4813717] [19-2594] (TMF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/26/19, docket entries, Opinion & Order 7/12/19, Judgment 7/12/19. [4813715] [19-2594] (TMF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4813712] [19-2594] (TMF) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.