This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 06:49:22 (UTC).

Piero Bugoni v. Google, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Piero Bugoni filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Google, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15360

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PIERO A. BUGONI

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant / Appellees

YAHOO! INC.

GOOGLE, INC.

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Piero A. Bugoni

160 W. Camino Real

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed order (MARY H. MURGUIA and DANIEL A. BRESS) A review of the record reflects that appellants February 23, 2021 notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the January 21, 2021 judgment in the district court. On March 1, 2021, appellant filed a motion for extension of time to appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(5). The district court has not yet had an opportunity to rule on that motion. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to rule on appellants March 1, 2021 motion to extend the time to appeal. The district court is requested to serve a copy of its decision on this court at its earliest convenience. If the district court grants the motion to extend time, appellant does not need to file a new notice of appeal. Briefing remains stayed pending further order of the court. The Clerk will send a copy of this order to the district judge. [12074451] (CKP) [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:15 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Piero A. Bugoni show of cause for appeal. Served on 03/29/2021. [12065746] (RL) [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:27 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The district courts judgment was entered on the docket on January 21, 2021. Appellants notice of appeal was filed in the district court on February 23, 2021. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12028387] (CKP) [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:55 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order (MARY H. MURGUIA and DANIEL A. BRESS) A review of the record reflects that appellants February 23, 2021 notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the January 21, 2021 judgment in the district court. On March 1, 2021, appellant filed a motion for extension of time to appeal pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(5). The district court has not yet had an opportunity to rule on that motion. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to rule on appellants March 1, 2021 motion to extend the time to appeal. The district court is requested to serve a copy of its decision on this court at its earliest convenience. If the district court grants the motion to extend time, appellant does not need to file a new notice of appeal. Briefing remains stayed pending further order of the court. The Clerk will send a copy of this order to the district judge. [12074451] (CKP) [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Piero A. Bugoni show of cause for appeal. Served on 03/29/2021. [12065746] (RL) [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The district courts judgment was entered on the docket on January 21, 2021. Appellants notice of appeal was filed in the district court on February 23, 2021. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12028387] (CKP) [Entered: 03/08/2021 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Piero A. Bugoni opening brief due 05/04/2021. [12021546] (RT) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yahoo! Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant