Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 06:01:16 (UTC).

Pickett v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Pickett filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3440

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

Gordon Pickett

Ayer, MA 01432

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Gordon Pickett

Attorney at Federal Medical Center

P.O. Box 879

Ayer, MA 01432

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Kaitlin Teresa Farrell Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271A Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by US mail.[2705903] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:10 AM]

#22

(#22) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by US mail.[2705901] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:10 AM]

#17

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [12], on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2699331] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:28 PM]

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2699329] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:25 PM]

#14

(#14) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 10/31/2019 by US mail.[2699318] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:16 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 10/31/2019 by US mail.[2699317] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:16 PM]

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2687411] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:54 PM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2686884] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:50 AM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2686126] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:08 PM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 10/11/2019, RECEIVED.[2686102] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:02 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED.[2705911] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D-P, [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED.[2705908] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by US mail.[2705903] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 11/06/2019 by US mail.[2705901] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/14/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [12], on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2699331] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2699329] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 10/31/2019 by US mail.[2699318] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 10/31/2019 by US mail.[2699317] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 11/05/2019 by US mail.[2699316] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Gordon Pickett, FILED. Service date 11/05/2019 by No service.[2699313] [19-3440] [Entered: 11/05/2019 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2687411] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY, Kaitlin T. Farrell, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney David C. James, SUBSTITUTED.[2687266] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2686884] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2686126] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2686110] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 10/11/2019, RECEIVED.[2686102] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gordon Pickett, FILED. [2686081] [19-3440] [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaitlin Teresa Farrell