This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 06:07:36 (UTC).

Phillips Morales, et al v. Intelsat Global Services Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Phillips Morales filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Intelsat Global Services Corp . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7041

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Francis Wood-Parker

Helga I. Burrell-Sahl

Dorothy Fields

Jane P. Kinzie

Bambi Prigel

Deborah K. Cooper

Sharon A. Riccardi

Nedda Krowitz

Luis Francesco T. Perrone

Paul P. Tan

Fernando van Reigersberg

Ruth C. Labardee

David Roy Neil Connick

John Tierney

Douglas Shannon

Phillips S. Morales

Frank A. L. Subaran

Martin P. Brown, Jr.

Lan N. Nguyen

Defendant / Appellee

Intelsat Global Service Corp., now known as Intelsat Global Service LLC

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Lawrence Philip Postol

Attorney at Postol Law Firm, P.C.

6842 Elm Street, Suite 300

Mclean, VA 20004-1405

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael S. Nadel

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Other Attorneys

Wayne A. Schrader

Attorney at Isler Dare PC

1945 Old Gallows Road, Suite 650

Vienna, VA 22182

 

Court Documents

Open Document

REPLY [1794203] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. to response [ # 1793015-2 ], [ # 1793015-3 ] [Service Date: 06/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1922 words. [19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1793812] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 06/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,989 words. [19-7002] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/21/2019 08:28 AM]

Open Document

REPLY [1793015] filed by All Plaintiffs in 19-7041 to response and RESPONSE filed to Cross Motion [ # 1792249-2 ] [Service Date: 06/17/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,873 words. [19-7041, 19-7002]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED EVENT] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/17/2019 09:39 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1792249] to motion certificate of appealability [ # 1788131-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1788131-3 ] combined with a MOTION to dismiss case filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. [Service Date: 06/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5022. [19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:12 PM]

Open Document

APPELLEE BRIEF [1791528] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,993 words. [19-7002] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:54 PM]

Open Document

AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791527] filed by John J. Calandra and co-counsel Lisa A. Gerson; Michael S. Nadel on behalf of Appellees Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. in 19-7002, 19-7041. [19-7002, 19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:52 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1788640] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1788440-2 ]; directing response to motion to consolidate [ # 1788168-2 ] Response due on 06/11/2019 [19-7041] [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1788440] to extend time to file response to 06/11/2019 filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. Length Certification: This document contains 166 words.. [19-7041] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:49 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788439] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. in 19-7041 [Service Date: 05/19/2019 ] [19-7041, 19-7002] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:43 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1788226] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:15 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1788225] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:14 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1788168] to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:55 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1788131] to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-7041]--[Edited 05/17/2019 by JAD] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:05 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1788128] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:00 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1788126] filed by appellants [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7041]--[Edited 05/16/2019 by AY] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:00 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788125] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:58 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1786957] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:29 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786940] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:04-cv-01044-TSC filed by Gomaa E. A. Abutaleb, Patricia Acosta, All Plaintiffs, Bob Ames, Virginia Aribe, Omar Atia, Magdy Battikha, Simon Bennett, Thomas Black, David Brown, Martin P. Brown, Jr., Helga I. Burrell-Sahl, Alfred Cammarata, Malcolm Chaires, Melvin R. Chamberlin, Aaron B. Coleman, David Roy Neil Connick, Deborah K. Cooper, Karla Costella, Alma L. Fagan, Luc Iano Fasano, Dorothy Fields, Gian Piero Forcina, John E. Gray, Rita T. Gray, Graciela Kelinsky, David J. Kennedy, Jane P. Kinzie, David Koff, Heida Kristjansdottir, Nedda Krowitz, Wade Krueger, Ruth Kupperschlag, Ruth C. Labardee, Sebastian Lasher, William Lee, Hugh Lewis, Gerald Joy-Pak Lo, Richard Magee, Erland Magnusson, Phillips S. Morales, Prakash M. Nadkarni, Carmen M. Nelson, Lan N. Nguyen, Alan Olson, Fernando P. Orlandi, James R. Owens, Luis Francesco T. Perrone, Robert Peters, Bambi Prigel, David Rees, Sharon A. Riccardi, Maria V. Ross, Irwin Rowe, Antonio Russo, Douglas Shannon, Victor J. Slabinski, Caryl J. Stalick, Matgaret A. Stevenson, Frank A. L. Subaran, Paul P. Tan, Timothy R. Thompson, John Tierney, Charles N. Tull, Fernando Van Reigersberg, Reginald Westlake, Hemlut Wild, Norman Williams, Laurence V. Wood, Jr. and Francis Wood-Parker. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7041. [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:11 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY [1794203] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. to response [ # 1793015-2 ], [ # 1793015-3 ] [Service Date: 06/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1922 words. [19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1793812] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 06/21/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,989 words. [19-7002] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/21/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY [1793015] filed by All Plaintiffs in 19-7041 to response and RESPONSE filed to Cross Motion [ # 1792249-2 ] [Service Date: 06/17/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,873 words. [19-7041, 19-7002]--[Edited 06/18/2019 by DJR--MODIFIED EVENT] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/17/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1792249] to motion certificate of appealability [ # 1788131-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1788131-3 ] combined with a MOTION to dismiss case filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. [Service Date: 06/11/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5022. [19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLEE BRIEF [1791528] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] Length of Brief: 12,993 words. [19-7002] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791527] filed by John J. Calandra and co-counsel Lisa A. Gerson; Michael S. Nadel on behalf of Appellees Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. in 19-7002, 19-7041. [19-7002, 19-7041] (Calandra, John) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788640] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1788440-2 ]; directing response to motion to consolidate [ # 1788168-2 ] Response due on 06/11/2019 [19-7041] [Entered: 05/20/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION [1788440] to extend time to file response to 06/11/2019 filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. Length Certification: This document contains 166 words.. [19-7041] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788439] filed by Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan, Intelsat Global Service Corp. and Intelsat, Ltd. in 19-7041 [Service Date: 05/19/2019 ] [19-7041, 19-7002] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788438] filed by Michael S. Nadel on behalf of Appellees Intelsat, Ltd. and Administrator, Intelsat Services Corp. Medical Benefit Plan in 19-7041, Appellee Intelsat Global Service Corp. in 19-7002. [19-7041, 19-7002] (Nadel, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2019 09:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1788226] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1788225] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/17/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/17/2019 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1788168] to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1788131] to consolidate cases filed by All Plaintiffs (Service Date: 05/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 5 pages. [19-7041]--[Edited 05/17/2019 by JAD] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1788128] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1788126] filed by appellants [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7041]--[Edited 05/16/2019 by AY] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1788125] filed by All Plaintiffs [Service Date: 05/16/2019 ] [19-7041] (Postol, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786957] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/07/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2019 [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786940] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:04-cv-01044-TSC filed by Gomaa E. A. Abutaleb, Patricia Acosta, All Plaintiffs, Bob Ames, Virginia Aribe, Omar Atia, Magdy Battikha, Simon Bennett, Thomas Black, David Brown, Martin P. Brown, Jr., Helga I. Burrell-Sahl, Alfred Cammarata, Malcolm Chaires, Melvin R. Chamberlin, Aaron B. Coleman, David Roy Neil Connick, Deborah K. Cooper, Karla Costella, Alma L. Fagan, Luc Iano Fasano, Dorothy Fields, Gian Piero Forcina, John E. Gray, Rita T. Gray, Graciela Kelinsky, David J. Kennedy, Jane P. Kinzie, David Koff, Heida Kristjansdottir, Nedda Krowitz, Wade Krueger, Ruth Kupperschlag, Ruth C. Labardee, Sebastian Lasher, William Lee, Hugh Lewis, Gerald Joy-Pak Lo, Richard Magee, Erland Magnusson, Phillips S. Morales, Prakash M. Nadkarni, Carmen M. Nelson, Lan N. Nguyen, Alan Olson, Fernando P. Orlandi, James R. Owens, Luis Francesco T. Perrone, Robert Peters, Bambi Prigel, David Rees, Sharon A. Riccardi, Maria V. Ross, Irwin Rowe, Antonio Russo, Douglas Shannon, Victor J. Slabinski, Caryl J. Stalick, Matgaret A. Stevenson, Frank A. L. Subaran, Paul P. Tan, Timothy R. Thompson, John Tierney, Charles N. Tull, Fernando Van Reigersberg, Reginald Westlake, Hemlut Wild, Norman Williams, Laurence V. Wood, Jr. and Francis Wood-Parker. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7041. [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7041] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.