This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:17:09 (UTC).

Philip Emiabata v. Branch Banking & Trust Company

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 Philip Emiabata filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Branch Banking Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1000

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY

JACQUE DOLOTINA, Asst. Manager at BB&T Co.

Plaintiff / Appellant

PHILIP EMIABATA

Pflugerville, TX 78660

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lauren Elizabeth Bohdan

Attorney at HEDRICK GARDNER KINCHELOE & GAROFALO, LLP

6000 Fairview Road

Charlotte, NC 28210

David Laurence Levy

Attorney at HEDRICK GARDNER KINCHELOE & GAROFALO, LLP

6000 Fairview Road

Charlotte, NC 28210

Michael Duane Jones

Attorney at HEDRICK, GARDNER, KINCHELOE & GAROFALO, LLP

P. O. Box 30397

Charlotte, NC 28230-0397

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Philip Emiabata

508 Evening Grosbeak Drive

Pflugerville, TX 78660

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren E. Bohdan for Branch Banking & Trust Company. [1000440555] [19-1000] Lauren Bohdan [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:13 AM]

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jacque Dolotina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446154] [19-1000] Lauren Bohdan [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:15 AM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jacque Dolotina re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Jacque Dolotina on 01/28/2019. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:32 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION by Philip Emiabata to amend/correct caption. [1000447423] [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:24 PM]

#12

(#12) MOTION by Philip Emiabata to extend filing time for informal opening brief. [1000447431] [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:29 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Branch Banking & Trust Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000440366] [19-1000] David Levy [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:09 PM]

#11

(#11) Notice issued re: motion to amend case caption deemed moot. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:25 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by MICHAEL DUANE JONES for Branch Banking & Trust Company. [1000440212] [19-1000] Michael Jones [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:08 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed [1000447436] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 31. Informal Opening Brief due 02/28/2019 Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:30 PM]

#2

(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/16/2019. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/02/2019 07:57 AM]

14 #2

Informal brief and directions

14 #1

Rule 45 notice

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/02/2019 07:58 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00529-TDS-JLW. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/02/2019 07:54 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Philip Emiabata re: failure to file informal brief. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 03/04/2019 07:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed [1000447436] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 31. Informal Opening Brief due 02/28/2019 Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by Philip Emiabata to extend filing time for informal opening brief. [1000447431] [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice issued re: motion to amend case caption deemed moot. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Philip Emiabata to amend/correct caption. [1000447423] [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Jacque Dolotina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000446154] [19-1000] Lauren Bohdan [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Jacque Dolotina re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Jacque Dolotina on 01/28/2019. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren E. Bohdan for Branch Banking & Trust Company. [1000440555] [19-1000] Lauren Bohdan [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Branch Banking & Trust Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000440366] [19-1000] David Levy [Entered: 01/16/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by MICHAEL DUANE JONES for Branch Banking & Trust Company. [1000440212] [19-1000] Michael Jones [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • (#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00529-TDS-JLW. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Philip Emiabata. Informal Opening Brief due 01/28/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/02/2019 07:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/16/2019. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/02/2019 07:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00529-TDS-JLW. Case manager: AWalker. [19-1000] AW [Entered: 01/02/2019 07:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.