This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:07:47 (UTC).

Phelipe Linstrom v. Quiktrip Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Phelipe Linstrom filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Quiktrip Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1258

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Phelipe A. Linstrom

Defendant / Appellee

Quiktrip Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael B. White

Attorney at EDELMAN & THOMPSON

Suite 1400, 3100 Broadway

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian M. Nye

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1500, 2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Karrie J. Clinkinbeard

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1500, 2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Paul L. Brusati

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom, w/service 03/24/2021. Length: 5,466 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Phelipe A. Linstrom due 03/29/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Quiktrip Corporation due on 04/23/2021. [5018308] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:28 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. New electronic copy of addendum due on 03/29/2021. [5018026] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:18 AM]

Open Document

Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. [5018022] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:10 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom - Joint Appendix - w/service 02/17/2021 [5005178] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 02/17/2021 11:59 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. Transcript ordered[5005174] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 02/17/2021 11:51 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Paul Brusati for Appellee Quiktrip Corporation w/service 02/15/2021 [5004434] [21-1258] (PLB) [Entered: 02/15/2021 10:05 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Quiktrip Corporation. - FOR CAL [5002589] [21-1258] (BMN) [Entered: 02/09/2021 08:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard for Appellee Quiktrip Corporation w/service 02/05/2021 [5001962] [21-1258] (KJC) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brian M. Nye for Appellee Quiktrip Corporation w/service 02/05/2021 [5001927] [21-1258] (BMN) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom w/service 02/04/2021 [5001488] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 02/04/2021 11:20 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/15/2021. Appendix due 03/25/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Phelipe A. Linstrom due 03/25/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5001205] [21-1258] (AEV) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:10 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5001198] [21-1258] (AEV) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:03 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 3 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 3 volumes each [5020697] [21-1258] (NDG) [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecord Deficiency Sent to Attorney Mr. Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. Record Deficiency due on 03/31/2021. [5019024-1] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/26/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5018308-2 ] filed by Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom 10 paper copies received, w/Addendum attached. [5019022] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/26/2021 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom, w/service 03/24/2021. [5018311] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom, w/service 03/24/2021. Length: 5,466 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Phelipe A. Linstrom due 03/29/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Quiktrip Corporation due on 04/23/2021. [5018308] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5018293] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5018292] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. New electronic copy of addendum due on 03/29/2021. [5018026] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. [5018022] [21-1258] (HAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5018000] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 03/24/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom - Joint Appendix - w/service 02/17/2021 [5005178] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 02/17/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom. Transcript ordered[5005174] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 02/17/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Paul Brusati for Appellee Quiktrip Corporation w/service 02/15/2021 [5004434] [21-1258] (PLB) [Entered: 02/15/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Quiktrip Corporation. - FOR CAL [5002589] [21-1258] (BMN) [Entered: 02/09/2021 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard for Appellee Quiktrip Corporation w/service 02/05/2021 [5001962] [21-1258] (KJC) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Brian M. Nye for Appellee Quiktrip Corporation w/service 02/05/2021 [5001927] [21-1258] (BMN) [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Michael B. White for Appellant Mr. Phelipe A. Linstrom w/service 02/04/2021 [5001488] [21-1258] (MBW) [Entered: 02/04/2021 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/15/2021. Appendix due 03/25/2021. BRIEF APPELLANT, Phelipe A. Linstrom due 03/25/2021 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5001205] [21-1258] (AEV) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Judgment 11/2/20, Order 2/3/21, docket entries, [5001204] [21-1258] (AEV) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5001198] [21-1258] (AEV) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QuikTrip Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karrie J. Clinkinbeard