This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/31/2020 at 06:09:19 (UTC).

Peter Vlaming v. West Point School Board

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Peter Vlaming filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against West Point School Board. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1940

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

PETER VLAMING

Defendant / Appellants

LAURA ABEL, in her official capacity as Division Superintendent

WEST POINT SCHOOL BOARD

SUZANNE AUNSPACH, or her Successor in Office, in her official capacity as Assistant Principal of West Point High School

JONATHAN HOCHMAN, in his official capacity as Principal of West Point High School

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Caleb Dalton

Attorney at ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

440 1St Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-0000

Shawn Voyles Esq.

Attorney at MCKENRY, DANCIGERS, DAWSON, PC

192 Ballard Court

Virginia Beach, VA 23462-6538

John J. Bursch

Attorney at BURSCH LAW PLLC

9339 Cherry Valley, Se

Caledonia, MI 49316

David Andrew Cortman

Attorney at ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, Ne

Lawrenceville, GA 30043

Shawn A. Voyles

Attorney at MCKENRY, DANCIGERS, DAWSON, PC

192 Ballard Court

Virginia Beach, VA 23462-6538

Tyson C. Langhofer

Attorney at ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM

20116 Ashbrook Place

Ashburn, VA 20147

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Alan E. Schoenfeld

Attorney at WILMERHALE LLP

250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Stacy Leann Haney

Attorney at HANEY PHINYOWATTANACHIP PLLC

11 South 12Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Paul Reinherz Wolfson

Attorney at WILMERHALE LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Bruce Martin Berman

Attorney at WILMERHALE LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Edward Henderson Williams II

Attorney at WILMERHALE LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Asaf Orr

Attorney at NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS

870 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Shannon Price Minter

Attorney at NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS

870 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Cayman Mitchell

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022-3908

Luke C. Platzer

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Kristen Green

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP

633 West 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2091

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

#30

29 #2

Appendix to Plaintiff-Appellee's Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene

29 #1

Plaintiff-Appellee's Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene

25 #2

Plaintiff-Appellee's Proposed Corrected Docketing Statement

25 #1

Plaintiff-Appellee's Letter regarding Objections to Docketing Statement

#24

#8

#7

6 #2

Additional Document

6 #1

MOTION

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY by John Doe to response [ # 30 ].. [20-1940] Luke Platzer [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY by John Doe to response [ # 29 ].. [20-1940] Luke Platzer [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Letter re: [ # 25 ] letter by West Point School Board, Laura Abel, Jonathan Hochman and Suzanne Aunspach . [1000827275] [20-1940] Paul Wolfson [Entered: 10/12/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Peter Vlaming to notice requesting response [ # 24 ], Motion for other relief [ # 23 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1940] Jonathan Dalton [Entered: 10/05/2020 07:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Peter Vlaming to notice requesting response [ # 24 ], Motion to intervene [ # 22 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1940] Jonathan Dalton [Entered: 10/05/2020 07:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 27 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 11/12/2020. Response brief due 12/10/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000822990] [20-1940] AB [Entered: 10/04/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman and West Point School Board to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until November 12, 2020.. Date and method of service: 10/02/2020 ecf. [1000822925] [20-1940] Paul Wolfson [Entered: 10/02/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Peter Vlaming. [20-1940] Jonathan Dalton [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Letter re: [ # 21 ] docketing statement by Peter Vlaming. [1000821673] [20-1940] Jonathan Dalton [Entered: 10/01/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE ISSUED to Peter Vlaming requesting response to Motion to intervene [ # 22 ], Motion to proceed under a pseudonym [ # 23 ]. Response due 10/05/2020. [1000817043] [20-1940] AB [Entered: 09/24/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by J. Caleb Dalton for Peter Vlaming. [1000805500] [20-1940] Jonathan Dalton [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Edward Williams for Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman and West Point School Board. [1000805216] [20-1940] Edward Williams [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alan E. Schoenfeld for Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman and West Point School Board. [1000805213] [20-1940] Alan Schoenfeld [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE ISSUED to Peter Vlaming requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 6 ]. Response due: 09/04/2020 by 12:00 p.m. [1000804803] [20-1940] AB [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman and West Point School Board for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 09/02/2020 ecf. [1000804596] [20-1940] Paul Wolfson [Entered: 09/02/2020 07:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Laura Abel, Suzanne Aunspach, Jonathan Hochman and West Point School Board. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000804595] [20-1940] Paul Wolfson [Entered: 09/02/2020 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson for West Point School Board, Jonathan Hochman, Suzanne Aunspach and Laura Abel. [1000804563] [20-1940] Paul Wolfson [Entered: 09/02/2020 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Bruce Martin Berman and Tania Faransso. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/13/2020. Response Brief due 11/10/2020. [20-1940] AB [Entered: 09/01/2020 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00773-JAG. Mailed to: Bruce Martin Berman and Tania Faransso. [20-1940] AB [Entered: 09/01/2020 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00773-JAG. Case manager: ABrownlee. [20-1940] AB [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon P. Minter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Asaf Orr