This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/13/2021 at 06:06:09 (UTC).

Peter Alden v. AECOM Technology Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Peter Alden filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AECOM Technology Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16002

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION, NASA, a Federal Agency

Plaintiff / Appellant

PETER ANGELO ALDEN

Fairhaven, MA 02719

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura Jean Maechtlen Esquire

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Alison Elaine Daw

Attorney at DOJ - Office of the U.S. Attorney

150 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 900

San Jose, CA 95113

Neill Tseng

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter Angelo Alden

12 Fisherman Rd.

Fairhaven, MA 02719

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12175034] (AF) [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:48 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. By July 14, 2021, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Robert Kaiser, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect.confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Robert Kaiser, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12154389] (AF) [Entered: 06/25/2021 10:09 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12175034] (AF) [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Alison Elaine Daw in 21-16002 substituted by Attorney Neill Tseng in 21-16002 [12172231] (DJV) [Entered: 07/14/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Neill T. Tseng (United States Attorney's Office, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, Box 36055, San Francisco, CA 94102) for Appellee NASA. Substitution for Attorney Alison Elaine Daw for Appellee NASA. Date of service: 07/14/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12172223] [21-16002] (Tseng, Neill) [Entered: 07/14/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed order MEDIATION (RSK): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. By July 14, 2021, the parties are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator in writing whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement discussions. The written response to this order and all future written or spoken communication with the mediator are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Robert Kaiser, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect.confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. The written response to this order should not be filed with the court; instead, the response should be sent directly to the Circuit Mediator by email (robert_kaiser@ca9.uscourts.gov) or mail (Robert Kaiser, Circuit Mediation Office, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, James R. Browning United States Courthouse, P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939). More detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures are included in the attachment to this order and on the Mediation Program web site (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12154389] (AF) [Entered: 06/25/2021 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Peter Angelo Alden opening brief due 08/16/2021. Appellees AECOM Technology Corporation and National Aeronautics and Space Administration answering brief due 09/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12142938] (RT) [Entered: 06/14/2021 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL AERONAUTICS AND SPACE ADMINISTRATION is a litigant