This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

Petar Mrkonjic v. Delta Family-Care and Survivor, et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Petar Mrkonjic filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Delta Family-Care and Survivor. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56120

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

PETAR MRKONJIC

Defendant / Appellants

DELTA FAMILY-CARE AND SURVIVORSHIP PLAN, an ERISA plan

DELTA RETIREMENT PLAN, an ERISA plan

THE ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE OF DELTA AIR LINES, INC., a plan administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Peter S. Sessions Esquire

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Glenn R. Kantor

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

John Timothy McDonald Esquire

Attorney at Thompson Hine LLP

Two Alliance Center, 3560 Lenox Road, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#12

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/08/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11486849] [19-56059, 19-56120] (BLS) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:53 PM]

#11

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/01/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11474535] [19-56059, 19-56120] (BLS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:25 AM]

#10

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11449323] [19-56059, 19-56120] (BLS) [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:16 PM]

#8

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Delta Family-Care and Survivorship Plan, Delta Retirement Plan and The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc. in 19-56120, Appellees Delta Family-Care and Survivorship Plan, Delta Retirement Plan and The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc. in 19-56059 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/30/2019. [11448225] [19-56120, 19-56059] (McDonald, John) [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:01 AM]

1 #4

Cross-Appeal Briefing Chart

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 11/08/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11486849] [19-56059, 19-56120] (BLS) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/01/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11474535] [19-56059, 19-56120] (BLS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11449323] [19-56059, 19-56120] (BLS) [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11448494][19-56120] (AD) [Entered: 09/30/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Delta Family-Care and Survivorship Plan, Delta Retirement Plan and The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc. in 19-56120, Appellees Delta Family-Care and Survivorship Plan, Delta Retirement Plan and The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc. in 19-56059 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/30/2019. [11448225] [19-56120, 19-56059] (McDonald, John) [Entered: 09/30/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/30/2019. First cross appeal brief due 12/18/2019 for Petar Mrkonjic. Second brief on cross appeal due 01/17/2020 for Delta Family-Care and Survivorship Plan, Delta Retirement Plan and The Administrative Committee of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Third brief on cross appeal due 02/18/2020 for Petar Mrkonjic. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11440296] [19-56120, 19-56059] (JBS) [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Timothy McDonald