This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/11/2020 at 06:05:37 (UTC).

PersonalWeb Technologies LLC v. EMC Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 PersonalWeb Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against EMC Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1554

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

PERSONALWEB TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Defendant / Appellees

EMC CORPORATION

VMWARE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lawrence Milton Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joel Lance Thollander

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Cynthia D. Vreeland

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Mark Christopher Fleming

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Robert Galvin

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

950 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Peter M. Dichiara

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#13

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#13) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1543 Lead with 20-1553 and 20-1554 Member Cases. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [683354] [20-1543, 20-1553, 20-1554] [LMN] [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER consolidating appeals 20-1543 with 20-1553 and 20-1554. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than May 11, 2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [683350] [20-1543, 20-1553, 20-1554] [LMN] [Entered: 04/01/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Robert M. Galvin as of counsel for Appellees EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682032] [20-1554] [Robert Galvin] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellees EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682026] [20-1554] [Cynthia Vreeland] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellees EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682024] [20-1554] [Cynthia Vreeland] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Peter M. Dichiara as of counsel for Appellees EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682019] [20-1554] [Peter Dichiara] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Mark C. Fleming as of counsel for Appellees EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682016] [20-1554] [Mark Fleming] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Cynthia D. Vreeland as principal counsel for Appellees EMC Corporation and VMware, Inc.. Service: 03/26/2020 by email. [682012] [20-1554] [Cynthia Vreeland] [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681074] [20-1554] [Joel Thollander] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681069] [20-1554] [Joel Thollander] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Joel L. Thollander as of counsel for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681068] [20-1554] [Joel Thollander] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Lawrence M. Hadley as principal counsel for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/23/2020 by email. [681053] [20-1554] [Lawrence Hadley] [Entered: 03/23/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/27/2020. [678250] Entry of Appearance is due 03/26/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/26/2020. Docketing Statement is due 03/26/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/11/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 03/12/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VMWARE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Level 3 Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PersonalWeb Technologies LLC is a litigant