This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2023 at 07:08:52 (UTC).

Persian Gulf, Inc. v. Alon USA Energy, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Persian Gulf, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Alon USA Energy, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-56016

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendants

BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS, LLC

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY, LLC

EQUILON ENTERPRISES, LLC, DBA Shell Oil Products US

EXXONMOBIL REFINING & SUPPLY COMPANY

VALERO MARKETING AND SUPPLY COMPANY

PHILLIPS 66

VALERO ENERGY CORPORATION

CONOCOPHILLIPS

KERN OIL & REFINING CO.

DOES, 1-25, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellee

PERSIAN GULF, INC., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellant

ALON USA ENERGY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert A. Sacks Esquire

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP

1888 Century Park, E, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1725

Samuel G. Liversidge

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

David Craig Kiernan

Attorney at Jones Day

555 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kent Michael Roger

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

One Market Street, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Dawn Sestito

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

400 S Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robin A. Wofford Esquire

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo, LLP

402 W Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Gerald Edward Hawxhurst

Attorney at Hawxhurst Harris LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 620

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Joshua D. Lichtman

Attorney at Fulbright & Jaworski LLP

555 South Flower Street, 41St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick J. Coughlin

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP

655 W Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Steven Francis Hubachek Esquire

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP

655 W Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Alexandra S. Bernay

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP

655 W Broadway, Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Carl Hittinger Esquire

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

1735 Market Street, Suite 3300

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7501

Tyson Herrold

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

1735 Market Street, Suite 3300

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7501

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#6

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56016, Appellee Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56010 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/04/2022. [12580264] [22-56016, 22-56010] (Hittinger, Carl) [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:29 AM]

#8

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Persian Gulf, Inc. in 22-56010 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/04/2022. [12580819] [22-56010, 22-56016] (Coughlin, Patrick) [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:33 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/30/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12584684] [22-56010, 22-56016] (CL) [Entered: 11/10/2022 11:18 AM]

#7

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12599654] [22-56010, 22-56016, 22-56017, 22-56018] (CL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:14 PM]

#11

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellee ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/21/2022. [12615353] [22-56010] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 22-56016. 12/21/2022 by TYL] (Sestito, Dawn) [Entered: 12/21/2022 06:50 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The parties stipulated motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) for voluntary dismissal of No. 22-56010 is granted. No. 22-56010 is dismissed with prejudice. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties stipulation. This order served on the district court acts as the mandate of this court as to No. 22-56010 only. No. 22-56016 will proceed and the following briefing schedule will govern: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s opening brief is now due February 10, 2023. Appellee Persian Gulf, Inc.s answering brief is due March 13, 2023. Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12628293] (AF) [Entered: 01/11/2023 01:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Docket(#15) Terminated attorney Carmen A. Medici for for appellee Persian Gulf, Inc. in 22-56016. [12637643] (HH) [Entered: 01/24/2023 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Carmen A. Medici for Appellee Persian Gulf, Inc.. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/24/2023. [12637637] [22-56016] (Coughlin, Patrick) [Entered: 01/24/2023 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY UPDATED. Streamlined request [12] by Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. opening brief due 03/03/2023. Appellee Persian Gulf, Inc. answering brief due 04/03/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12629498]--[Edited 01/13/2023 by DLM] (DLM) [Entered: 01/12/2023 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.. New requested due date is 03/03/2023. [12629030] [22-56016] (Hittinger, Carl) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The parties stipulated motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) for voluntary dismissal of No. 22-56010 is granted. No. 22-56010 is dismissed with prejudice. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties stipulation. This order served on the district court acts as the mandate of this court as to No. 22-56010 only. No. 22-56016 will proceed and the following briefing schedule will govern: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s opening brief is now due February 10, 2023. Appellee Persian Gulf, Inc.s answering brief is due March 13, 2023. Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc.s optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12628293] (AF) [Entered: 01/11/2023 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellee ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/21/2022. [12615353] [22-56010] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 22-56016. 12/21/2022 by TYL] (Sestito, Dawn) [Entered: 12/21/2022 06:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12599654] [22-56010, 22-56016, 22-56017, 22-56018] (CL) [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/30/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12584684] [22-56010, 22-56016] (CL) [Entered: 11/10/2022 11:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Persian Gulf, Inc. in 22-56010 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/04/2022. [12580819] [22-56010, 22-56016] (Coughlin, Patrick) [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/04/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12580464]. [22-56016] (AD) [Entered: 11/04/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56016, Appellee Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56010 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/04/2022. [12580264] [22-56016, 22-56010] (Hittinger, Carl) [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Robert A. Sacks for party(s) - BP West Coast Products, LLC, in case 22-56016. [12579041] [22-56016, 22-56010] (RT) [Entered: 11/02/2022 03:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Tyson Herrold for party(s) Appellee Alon USA Energy, Inc., in case 22-56010 Attorney(s) Tyson Herrold for party(s) Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc., in case 22-56016. [12578649] [22-56010, 22-56016] (DJV) [Entered: 11/02/2022 11:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tyson Y. Herrold (Baker & Hostetler LLP - 1735 Market Street, Suite 3300, Philadelphia, PA 19103) for Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56016, Appellee Alon USA Energy, Inc. in 22-56010. Date of service: 11/02/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12578623] [22-56016, 22-56010] (Herrold, Tyson) [Entered: 11/02/2022 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Alon USA Energy, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/08/2022. First cross appeal brief due 02/06/2023 for Persian Gulf, Inc.. Second brief on cross appeal due 03/07/2023 for Alon USA Energy, Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Equilon Enterprises, LLC, ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Phillips 66, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC and Valero Marketing and Supply Company. Third brief on cross appeal due 04/07/2023 for Persian Gulf, Inc. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Alon USA Energy, Inc. is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12577787] [22-56016, 22-56010] (RT) [Entered: 11/01/2022 11:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Alon USA Energy, Inc. is a litigant