This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/14/2021 at 06:34:07 (UTC).

Perry v. John A. Guerrieri, DDS PLLC

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Perry filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against John A Guerrieri, DDS PLLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-587

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Angel Perry

Defendant / Appellee

John A. Guerrieri, DDS PLLC, DBA John A. Guerrieri, DDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Stacey Eve Trien Esq.

Attorney at Adams Leclair LLP

28 East Main Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael Frank Geraci Esq.

Attorney at Michael Geraci Law Offices

1 East Main Street

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER, dated 05/07/2021, Appellant must file a transcript status update letter or a scheduling notification letter within 7 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the Court setting a default briefing deadline, FILED.[3095693] [21-587] [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:57 AM]

#25

(#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[3095376] [21-587] [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:50 PM]

22 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

22 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#19

(#19) INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant Angel Perry, past due material(s) to be submitted by 04/26/2021, SENT.[3077652] [21-587] [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:01 PM]

#18

(#18) NOTICE, to Appellee John A. Guerrieri, DDS PLLC , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3077650] [21-587] [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:59 PM]

#17

(#17) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[3077645] [21-587] [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:58 PM]

#14

(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. Service date 04/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3072982] [21-587] [Entered: 04/07/2021 05:34 PM]

#13

(#13) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/22/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3065981] [21-587] [Entered: 03/29/2021 04:50 PM]

#8

(#8) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by email, US mail.[3064886] [21-587] [Entered: 03/26/2021 04:49 PM]

#7

(#7) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by email, US mail.[3064882] [21-587] [Entered: 03/26/2021 04:48 PM]

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/11/2021, RECEIVED.[3056191] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:33 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 02/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3056188] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:33 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[3056187] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:32 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER, dated 05/07/2021, Appellant must file a transcript status update letter or a scheduling notification letter within 7 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the Court setting a default briefing deadline, FILED.[3095693] [21-587] [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[3095376] [21-587] [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3089533] [21-587] [Entered: 04/29/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant Angel Perry, past due material(s) to be submitted by 04/26/2021, SENT.[3077652] [21-587] [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE, to Appellee John A. Guerrieri, DDS PLLC , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3077650] [21-587] [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[3077645] [21-587] [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. Service date 04/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3072982] [21-587] [Entered: 04/07/2021 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 04/22/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3065981] [21-587] [Entered: 03/29/2021 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by email, US mail.[3064886] [21-587] [Entered: 03/26/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by email, US mail.[3064882] [21-587] [Entered: 03/26/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Michael Frank Geraci, Esq. for Appellee John A. Guerrieri, DDS PLLC, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3056193] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, district court receipt # 0209-4184602, FILED.[3056192] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/11/2021, RECEIVED.[3056191] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 02/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3056188] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[3056187] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Angel Perry, FILED. [3056183] [21-587] [Entered: 03/15/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Frank Geraci