This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2019 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

Perry Bonin, et al v. Sabine River Authority of TX, et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Perry Bonin filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Sabine River Authority of TX. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-40299

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ENTERGY LOUISIANA, L.L.C.

CLECO POWER, L.L.C.

SABINE RIVER AUTHORITY OF LOUISIANA

SABINE RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS

ENTERGY TEXAS, INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellants

JACQUELINE ACREMAN

MICHAEL MANUEL

ROBERT ACREMAN

ACE CHANDLER

PERRY BONIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Paul A. Scheurich

Attorney at Entergy Services, Incorporated

350 Pine Street

Beaumont, TX 77704-0000

Frank Anthony Domino

Attorney at MehaffyWeber, P.C.

2615 Calder Avenue

Beaumont, TX 77704

Matthew James Paul

Attorney at Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street, Ll&E Tower

New Orleans, LA 70112

William Raley Alford Esq. III

Attorney at Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street, Ll&E Tower

New Orleans, LA 70112

John Powers Wolff III

Attorney at Keogh, Cox & Wilson, Limited

701 Main Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

William S. Helfand

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, L.L.P.

24 Greenway Plaza, Weslayan Tower

Houston, TX 77046

Lawrence Louis Germer

Attorney at Germer, P.L.L.C.

550 Fannin Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

Charles W. Goehringer Jr.

Attorney at Germer, P.L.L.C.

550 Fannin Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

Kelli Burris Smith

Attorney at Germer, P.L.L.C.

2929 Allen Parkway, America Tower

Houston, TX 77019

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John G. Werner

Attorney at Reaud, Morgan & Quinn, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 26005

Beaumont, TX 77720-6005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jacqueline Acreman, Mr. Robert Acreman, Mr. Perry Bonin, Mr. Ace Chandler and Mr. Michael Manuel [19-40299] (CBW) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:50 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40299] (Frank Anthony Domino ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:09 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Matthew James Paul ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 05:03 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Mr. John G. Werner for Appellants Mr. Perry Bonin, Mr. Ace Chandler, Mr. Michael Manuel, Mr. Robert Acreman and Ms. Jacqueline Acreman is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-40299] (LBM) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:21 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (William Raley Alford III) [Entered: 04/23/2019 05:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Charles W. Goehringer Jr.) [Entered: 05/17/2019 12:55 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40299] (Mark William Frasher ) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:31 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Kelli Burris Smith ) [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:49 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Paul A. Scheurich for Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. and Entergy Texas, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Paul A. Scheurich ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:04 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9025214-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/24/2019 for Appellants Jacqueline Acreman, Robert Acreman, Perry Bonin, Ace Chandler and Michael Manuel [19-40299] (CBW) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:03 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/26/2019 for Appellants Jacqueline Acreman, Robert Acreman, Perry Bonin, Ace Chandler and Michael Manuel. [19-40299] (MRW) [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kelli Burris Smith for Appellee Sabine River Authority of Texas in case 19-40299 [19-40299] (AGL) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles W. Goehringer Jr. for party(s) Appellee Sabine River Authority of Texas, in case 19-40299 [19-40299] (AGL) [Entered: 05/20/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/26/2019 for Appellants Jacqueline Acreman, Robert Acreman, Perry Bonin, Ace Chandler and Michael Manuel. [19-40299] (MRW) [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-40299] (MRW) [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Kelli Burris Smith ) [Entered: 05/17/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Charles W. Goehringer Jr.) [Entered: 05/17/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John G. Werner for Appellant Jacqueline Acreman in 19-40299, Attorney John G. Werner for Appellant Robert Acreman in 19-40299, Attorney John G. Werner for Appellant Michael Manuel in 19-40299, Attorney John G. Werner for Appellant Ace Chandler in 19-40299, Attorney John G. Werner for Appellant Perry Bonin in 19-40299 [19-40299] (CAG) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John G. Werner for Ms. Jacqueline Acreman, Mr. Robert Acreman, Mr. Perry Bonin, Mr. Ace Chandler and Mr. Michael Manuel for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40299] (John G. Werner ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Mr. John G. Werner for Appellants Mr. Perry Bonin, Mr. Ace Chandler, Mr. Michael Manuel, Mr. Robert Acreman and Ms. Jacqueline Acreman is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [19-40299] (LBM) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40299] (Mark William Frasher ) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Raley Alford III for party(s) Appellee Cleco Power, L.L.C., in case 19-40299 [19-40299] (CAG) [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul A. Scheurich for Appellee Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. in 19-40299, Attorney Paul A. Scheurich for Appellee Entergy Texas, Incorporated in 19-40299 [19-40299] (CAG) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Frank Anthony Domino for Appellee Cleco Power, L.L.C. in 19-40299, Attorney Frank Anthony Domino for Appellee Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. in 19-40299, Attorney Frank Anthony Domino for Appellee Entergy Texas, Incorporated in 19-40299 [19-40299] (CAG) [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Matthew James Paul ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (William Raley Alford III) [Entered: 04/23/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Paul A. Scheurich for Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. and Entergy Texas, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40299] (Paul A. Scheurich ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40299] (Frank Anthony Domino ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9025214-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/24/2019 for Appellants Jacqueline Acreman, Robert Acreman, Perry Bonin, Ace Chandler and Michael Manuel [19-40299] (CBW) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEETS.) [19-40299] (CBW) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Jacqueline Acreman, Mr. Robert Acreman, Mr. Perry Bonin, Mr. Ace Chandler and Mr. Michael Manuel [19-40299] (CBW) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.