This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/04/2023 at 05:33:01 (UTC).

Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC v. Pablo Morales, et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Pablo Morales,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-55189

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

 

Party Details

Appellant

PERRIN BERNARD SUPOWITZ, LLC, a California LLC, DBA Individual Foodservice

Counter Claimant

LEGACY WHOLESALE GROUP, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Corporation

Defendant / Appellees

PABLO MORALES, an individual

SAVINO MORALES, an individual

SERGIO ESCAMILLA, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Dan Forman

Emil W. Herich

Defendant / Appellee and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Scott Michael Lesowitz

Steven Gebelin

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed March 1, 2023 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than March 29, 2023; the answering brief is due April 26, 2023 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12666576] (RT) [Entered: 03/03/2023 09:51 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed March 1, 2023 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than March 29, 2023; the answering brief is due April 26, 2023 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12666576] (RT) [Entered: 03/03/2023 09:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Emil W. Herich for party(s) Appellant Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC, in case 23-55189. [12666411] (BJK) [Entered: 03/02/2023 06:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Emil Walter Herich (KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP, 1801 Century Park East, Suite 2300, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellant Perrin Bernard Supowitz, LLC. Date of service: 03/02/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12666364] [23-55189] (Herich, Emil) [Entered: 03/02/2023 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12665719] (RT) [Entered: 03/02/2023 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less