Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2021 at 06:03:32 (UTC).

Perez v. JPMorgan Chase Bank

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Perez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10226

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Maricela Perez

Defendant / Appellees

ARNS Investments, L.L.C.

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Brinkley

Attorney at Brinkley Law, P.L.L.C.

P.O. Box 820711

Fort Worth, TX 76182-0711

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eric G. Carlson

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

2001 Bryan Street, Bryan Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcie Lynn Schout Esq.

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

2001 Bryan Street, Bryan Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

William Lance Lewis Esq.

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

2001 Bryan Street, Bryan Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-10226] (William Lance Lewis ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10226] (Marcie Lynn Schout ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:50 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/03/2021 for Appellant Maricela Perez. [21-10226] (DDL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:33 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9527964-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:16 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maricela Perez [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Lance Lewis for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 21-10226 [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marcie Lynn Schout for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 21-10226 [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/25/2021 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-10226] (William Lance Lewis ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10226] (Marcie Lynn Schout ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/03/2021 for Appellant Maricela Perez. [21-10226] (DDL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-10226] (DDL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:19-CV-2412. Electronic ROA due on 04/01/2021. [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9527964-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maricela Perez [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric G Carlson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcie Lynn Schout Esq.