This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:16 (UTC).

Percy St. George v. Superintendent Dallas SCI, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Percy St George filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Superintendent Dallas SCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2638

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SUPERINTENDENT DALLAS SCI

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

DISTRICT ATTORNEY PHILADELPHIA

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Plaintiff / Appellant

PERCY ST. GEORGE

Dallas, PA 18612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

District Attorney Philadelphia

Attorney at Philadelphia County Office of District Attorney

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Max C. Kaufman Esq.

Attorney at Philadelphia County Office of District Attorney

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Ronald Eisenberg Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Percy St. George

Attorney at Dallas SCI

1000 Follies Road

Dallas, PA 18612

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

DC Order

Open Document #3

DC Order

Open Document #7

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document #5

Caption

Open Document #6

Standing Order

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Percy St. George for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 08/08/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/25/2019. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 07/31/2019 07:52 AM]

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document #4

DC Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Max C. Kaufman on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Dallas SCI; District Attorney Philadelphia; Attorney General Pennsylvania. [19-2638] (MCK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:14 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Percy St. George for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 08/08/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/25/2019. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 07/31/2019 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Max C. Kaufman on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Dallas SCI; District Attorney Philadelphia; Attorney General Pennsylvania. [19-2638] (MCK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Percy St. George in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00905. (MB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.