This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/23/2022 at 06:06:35 (UTC).

People of the State of Califor v. Miguel Cardona, et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of Califor filed an Other lawsuit against Miguel Cardona,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16980

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant / Appellees

MIGUEL A. CARDONA, in his official capacity as Secretary of Education

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nicklas Arnold Akers

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Bernard Ardavan Eskandari

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 S Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Amos Hartston

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 S Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Christopher Myron Lapinig

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 S Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Daniel Allen Osborn

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Sarah Jane Clark

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant People of the State of California Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/01/2021. [12302978] [21-16980] (Eskandari, Bernard) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:15 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#12) Terminated Unregistered Attorney Kathryn L. Wyer for USEDU and Miguel A. Cardona in 21-16980. Parties have alternate counsel. [12340161] (SVG) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Sarah Jane Clark for party(s) Appellee USEDU and Appellee Miguel A. Cardona, in case 21-16980. [12338987] (QDL) [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Jane Clark (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Appellate Staff, 950 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Washington DC, 20530) for Appellees Miguel A. Cardona and USEDU. Date of service: 01/12/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12338936] [21-16980] (Clark, Sarah) [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Daniel Allen Osborn for party(s) Appellant People of the State of California. [12319480] (RL) [Entered: 12/17/2021 02:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Allen Osborn (California Attorney General's Office, 1515 Clay Street, 20th Floor, Oakland, CA 94612) for Appellant People of the State of California. Date of service: 12/17/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12319396] [21-16980] (Osborn, Daniel) [Entered: 12/17/2021 01:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Amos Hartston for party(s) Appellant People of the State of California, in case 21-16980. [12312975] (QDL) [Entered: 12/10/2021 03:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amos E. Hartston (California Department of Justice) for Appellant People of the State of California. Date of service: 12/10/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12312872] [21-16980] (Hartston, Amos) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/01/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12303278]. [21-16980] (AD) [Entered: 12/01/2021 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant People of the State of California Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/01/2021. [12302978] [21-16980] (Eskandari, Bernard) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Christopher Myron Lapinig for party(s) Appellant People of the State of California. [12299894] (RL) [Entered: 11/29/2021 02:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher Myron Lapinig (California Department of Justice, Consumer Protection Section, 300 S. Spring St., Ste. 1702, Los Angeles, CA 90013) for Appellant People of the State of California. Date of service: 11/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12299759] [21-16980] (Lapinig, Christopher) [Entered: 11/29/2021 01:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant People of the State of California Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/01/2021. Transcript ordered by 12/23/2021. Transcript due 01/24/2022. Appellant People of the State of California opening brief due 03/03/2022. Appellees Miguel A. Cardona and U.S. Department of Education answering brief due 04/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12298213] (RT) [Entered: 11/24/2021 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less