This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/30/2020 at 06:42:19 (UTC).

People First of Alabama, et al v. Secretary of State, et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 People First of Alabama filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Secretary of State. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13695

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees and Plaintiff / Appellants

BLACK VOTERS MATTER CAPACITY BUILDING INSTITUTE

GREATER BIRMINGHAM MINISTRIES

HOWARD PORTER, JR.

ALABAMA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP

ANNIE CAROLYN THOMPSON

PEOPLE FIRST OF ALABAMA

SHERYL THREADGILL-MATTHEWS

TERESA BETTIS

ERIC PEEBLES

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Defendant / Appellants and Defendant / Appellees

DON DAVIS

SECRETARY OF STATE FOR THE STATE OF ALABAMA

STATE OF ALABAMA

JOJO SCHWARZAUER

Amicus Curiae

STATE OF KENTUCKY

STATE OF KANSAS

STATE OF TEXAS

STATE OF NEBRASKA

AARP FOUNDATION

STATE OF MISSISSIPPI

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen D. Brody

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

1625 Eye St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Caren E. Short

Attorney at Southern Poverty Law Center

150 E Ponce De Leon Ave Ste 340

Decatur, GA 30030

Peter Friedman

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

1625 Eye St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jenny R. Ryan

Attorney at Alabama Disabilities Advocacy Program (ADAP)

Po Box 870395

Tuscaloosa, AL 35487-0001

Deuel Ross

Attorney at NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.

40 Rector St Fl 5

New York, NY 10006

Liliana Zaragoza

Attorney at NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.

40 Rector St Fl 5

New York, NY 10006

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Norbert H. Williams

Attorney at Means Gillis Law, LLC

60 Commer St Ste 200

Montgomery, AL 36104

Donald McKinley Carroll

Attorney at Jefferson County Attorney's Office

716 Richard Arrington Jr Blvd N Ste 280

Birmingham, AL 35203-0121

Constance Walker

Attorney at Haskell Slaughter Gallion & Walker, LLC

8104 B Seaton Pl

Montgomery, AL 36116

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer S. Holifield

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, LLC

5 Dauphin St Ste 301, Po Box 11

Mobile, AL 36601-0011

Jerome E. Speegle

Attorney at Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, LLC

5 Dauphin St Ste 301, Po Box 11

Mobile, AL 36601-0011

Brenton M. Smith

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Alexander Barrett Bowdre

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Jeremy Stone Weber

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

James W. Davis

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Robert F. Dyar

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP

1901 6Th Ave N Ste 3000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Todd D. Engelhardt

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP

1901 6Th Ave N Ste 3000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jay Michael Ross

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP

11 N Water St Ste 23200

Mobile, AL 36602

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment and Order, DE # 251

Open Document #3

USDC Findings of Fact, DE # 250

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMOTION MOOT: Motion for recusal is MOOT [ # 9206738-2 ] due to clerk's order filed 11/16/2020. Motion filed by Appellant Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, et al. [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellants Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 11/16/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants Greater Birmingham Ministries, People First of Alabama, Eric Peebles, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson, Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Teresa Bettis and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9237152-2 ] [Entered: 11/16/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. Motion is Unopposed. [9237152-1] [20-13695] (ECF: Deuel Ross) [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/23/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/13/2020 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellants-Cross Appellees Secretary of State for the State of Alabama, JoJo Schwarzauer, Don Davis and State of Alabama's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date, this appeal will proceed with Cross Appellants (now the main appeal)--[Edited 11/13/2020 by AGW] [Entered: 11/13/2020 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants-Cross Appellees State of Alabama and Secretary of State for the State of Alabama, JoJo Schwarzauer and Don Davis is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9236110-2 ]--[Edited 11/13/2020 by AGW] [Entered: 11/13/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Secretary of State for the State of Alabama and State of Alabama. Motion is Unopposed. [9236110-1] [20-13695] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 11/12/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Deuel Ross for Appellees-Cross Appellants Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13695] (ECF: Deuel Ross) [Entered: 11/10/2020 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Deuel Ross for Appellees-Cross Appellants Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. [20-13695] (ECF: Deuel Ross) [Entered: 11/10/2020 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brenton M. Smith for Secretary of State for the State of Alabama and State of Alabama. [20-13695] (ECF: Brenton Smith) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mahogane D. Reed for Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. [20-13695] (ECF: Mahogane Reed) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Natasha Clarise Merle for Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. [20-13695] (ECF: Natasha Merle) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James W. Davis for Secretary of State for the State of Alabama and State of Alabama. [20-13695] (ECF: James Davis) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samuel Spital for People First of Alabama Eric Peebles Howard Porter, Jr. Annie Carolyn Thompson Greater Birmingham Ministries Alabama State Conference of the NAACP Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute Teresa Bettis Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews [20-13695] (ECF: Samuel Spital) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Deuel Ross for Alabama State Conference of the NAACP, Teresa Bettis, Black Voters Matter Capacity Building Institute, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Eric Peebles, People First of Alabama, Howard Porter, Jr., Annie Carolyn Thompson and Sheryl Threadgill-Matthews. [20-13695] (ECF: Deuel Ross) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13695] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 10/02/2020 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by A. Barrett Bowdre for John Merrill and the State of Alabama [20-13695] (ECF: Alexander Bowdre) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmund G. LaCour for John Merrill and the State of Alabama [20-13695] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Don Davis, JoJo Schwarzauer, Secretary of State for the State of Alabama and State of Alabama on 09/30/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/15/2020 as to Appellant Secretary of State for the State of Alabama. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/29/2020 as to Appellee People First of Alabama [Entered: 10/01/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People First of Alabama is a litigant

Latest cases where AARP Foundation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant