This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 06:07:24 (UTC).

In re: PennEast Pipeline Co LLC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 In re PennEast Pipeline Co LLC was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1210

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants

NEW JERSEY STATE AGRICULTURE DEVELOPMENT COMMITTEE

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

NEW JERSEY MOTOR VEHICLE COMMISSION

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

DELAWARE & RARITAN CANAL COMMISSION

NEW JERSEY WATER SUPPLY AUTHORITY

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

Defendant

JERSEY CENTRAL POWER & LIGHT CO

Plaintiff / Appellee

In re: PENNEAST PIPELINE CO LLC

Defendant / Appellee

TOWNSHIP OF HOPEWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Mark A. Collier Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick J. McAuley Esq.

Attorney at Connell Foley

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Michael J. Affrunti Esq.

Attorney at Connell Foley

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Kevin J. Coakley Esq.

Attorney at Connell Foley

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Maureen T. Coghlan Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

James M. Graziano Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Timothy P. Duggan Esq.

Attorney at Stark & Stark

993 Lenox Drive, Building 2

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy Duggan on behalf of Appellee(s) Township of Hopewell. [19-1210]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by KR] (TPD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 06:50 PM]

Open Document #6

OPINION

Open Document #5

ORDER

Open Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

STANDING ORDER

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey in 19-1191, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission in 19-1192, 19-1193, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, State of New Jersey, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission in 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation and New Jersey Department of Treasury in 19-1197, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission in 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232. Certificate of Service dated 03/28/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MAC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 05:42 PM]

Open Document

Calendared for Thursday, 06/06/2019. Calendar Clerk: PM. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (PM) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:15 PM]

Open Document

ORDER (CHAGARES and JORDAN, Circuit Judges) granting in part motion for stay filed by Appellants New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission. In the event Appellee transitions from the surveying and testing phase to the construction phase of the pipeline project, physical construction of the pipeline shall be stayed pending this appeal. Additionally, the just compensation portion of the litigation is stayed pending this appeal. Appellants' Motion to Expedite is granted. Appellants' Opening Brief of no more than 14, 000 words must be filed and served within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Appellee's Brief must be filed and served within twenty (20) days of service of Appellants' Brief. A reply brief, if any, must be filed and served within ten (10) days of service of the Appellee's Brief. The matter will be assigned to the first merits panel available at the conclusion of briefing, filed. Panel No.: ECO-026E. Chagares, Authoring Judge. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (KR) [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Reply to Response

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Response to Motion for a Stay and Expedited Appeal

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MTC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:46 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MTC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:45 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 19-1191 through 19-1232 for all purposes. The parties are advised that all case opening forms, motions and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Courts electronic case filing (ECF) system. All required case opening forms should be filed within 14 days of the date of this Order. For ease of docketing, the State Defendants have been added to the case by department as listed on the notice of appeal rather than by how the State Defendants were listed on each individual docket, filed. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (LML) [Entered: 01/30/2019 11:39 AM]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey in 19-1191, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission in 19-1192, 19-1193, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, State of New Jersey, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission in 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation and New Jersey Department of Treasury in 19-1197, Attorney Mark A. Collier, Esq. for Appellants State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission in 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232. Certificate of Service dated 03/28/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MAC) [Entered: 03/28/2019 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Calendared for Thursday, 06/06/2019. Calendar Clerk: PM. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (PM) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (CHAGARES and JORDAN, Circuit Judges) granting in part motion for stay filed by Appellants New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission. In the event Appellee transitions from the surveying and testing phase to the construction phase of the pipeline project, physical construction of the pipeline shall be stayed pending this appeal. Additionally, the just compensation portion of the litigation is stayed pending this appeal. Appellants' Motion to Expedite is granted. Appellants' Opening Brief of no more than 14, 000 words must be filed and served within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Appellee's Brief must be filed and served within twenty (20) days of service of Appellants' Brief. A reply brief, if any, must be filed and served within ten (10) days of service of the Appellee's Brief. The matter will be assigned to the first merits panel available at the conclusion of briefing, filed. Panel No.: ECO-026E. Chagares, Authoring Judge. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (KR) [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey to Response to motion for stay, motion to Expedite, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232]--[Edited 03/15/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC to motion for stay, motion to expedite the appeals. Certificate of Service dated 03/12/2019. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by KR] (JMG) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy Duggan on behalf of Appellee(s) Township of Hopewell. [19-1210]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by KR] (TPD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) Any response to Appellants' motion for stay pending appeal and to expedite appeal must be filed and served on or before 4:00 p.m. on Tuesday, March12, 2019. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (HAG) [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey to stay District Court Order Pending Resolution of the Appeal, to Expedite the motion and the appeals with proposed briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 03/05/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232]--[Edited 03/05/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Timothy P. Duggan, Esq. for Township of Hopewell requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/12/2019. [19-1192, 19-1201, 19-1208, 19-1210, 19-1214, 19-1226] (KR) [Entered: 02/26/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PARTY NOT PARTICIPATING: Patrick J. McAuley, Esq. for Jersey Central Power & Light Co in 19-1191, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1196, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1206, 19-1203, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1219, 19-1193, 19-1209, 19-1220, 19-1210, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1217, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1224, 19-1205, 19-1204, 19-1225, 19-1213, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1214, 19-1229, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1230, 19-1192, 19-1218, 19-1231, 19-1194, 19-1232 will not participate in this appeal, received. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (KR) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey in 19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232, received. --[Edited 02/13/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey in 19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232, filed.--[Edited 02/13/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court in 19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232]--[Edited 02/13/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark Collier on behalf of Appellant(s) State of New Jersey (NJ) , NJ Department of Environmental Protection, State Agriculture Development Committee, Delaware and Raritan Canal Commission, NJ Water Supply Authority, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, NJ Motor Vehicle Comm.. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MAC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC in 19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232, filed. --[Edited 02/13/2019 by KR] (MTC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MTC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (MTC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (KR) [Entered: 01/30/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 19-1191 through 19-1232 for all purposes. The parties are advised that all case opening forms, motions and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Courts electronic case filing (ECF) system. All required case opening forms should be filed within 14 days of the date of this Order. For ease of docketing, the State Defendants have been added to the case by department as listed on the notice of appeal rather than by how the State Defendants were listed on each individual docket, filed. [19-1191, 19-1192, 19-1193, 19-1194, 19-1195, 19-1196, 19-1197, 19-1198, 19-1199, 19-1200, 19-1201, 19-1202, 19-1203, 19-1204, 19-1205, 19-1206, 19-1207, 19-1208, 19-1209, 19-1210, 19-1211, 19-1212, 19-1213, 19-1214, 19-1215, 19-1216, 19-1217, 19-1218, 19-1219, 19-1220, 19-1221, 19-1222, 19-1223, 19-1224, 19-1225, 19-1226, 19-1227, 19-1228, 19-1229, 19-1230, 19-1231, 19-1232] (LML) [Entered: 01/30/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Delaware & Raritan Canal Commission, New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, New Jersey Department of Transportation, New Jersey Department of the Treasury, New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission, New Jersey State Agriculture Development Committee, New Jersey Water Supply Authority and State of New Jersey in District Court No. 3-18-cv-01774. (LMR) [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less