This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/10/2022 at 06:09:43 (UTC).

Penn Star Insurance Company v. Henry Aguila, et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Penn Star Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Henry Aguila,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55664

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendants

THEE AGUILA, INC., a California Corporation

JULIE N. NONG, an individual

JOHN FITZPATRICK VANNUCCI, an individual

CENTURY LAW GROUP, LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership

PICO RIVERA FIRST MORTGAGE INVESTORS, LP, a limited partnership

GUINEVERE M. MALLEY, an individual

ROCIO ROSALES, an individual

DOES, 1-50, inclusive

Plaintiff / Appellee

PENN STAR INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation

Defendant / Appellant

HENRY AGUILA, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Andres Hurwitz

Attorney at Demler, Armstrong & Rowland, LLP

4500 E Pacific Coast Highway, 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Ronald Durwin Tym Esquire

Attorney at The Tym Firm

30526 Rainbow View Dr.

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12501049] (BLS) [Entered: 07/25/2022 10:52 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Henry Aguila Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/01/2022. [12505827] [22-55664] (Tym, Ronald) [Entered: 08/01/2022 09:03 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/23/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12508126] (CL) [Entered: 08/02/2022 05:05 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12524101] (CL) [Entered: 08/23/2022 02:16 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Henry Aguila to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Henry Aguila opening brief due 10/11/2022. Appellee Penn Star Insurance Company answering brief due 11/10/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12533756] (JN) [Entered: 09/06/2022 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Henry Aguila. New requested due date is 10/07/2022. [12533436] [22-55664] (Tym, Ronald) [Entered: 09/06/2022 09:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12524101] (CL) [Entered: 08/23/2022 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/23/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12508126] (CL) [Entered: 08/02/2022 05:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/01/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12506337]. [22-55664] (AD) [Entered: 08/01/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Henry Aguila Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/01/2022. [12505827] [22-55664] (Tym, Ronald) [Entered: 08/01/2022 09:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12501049] (BLS) [Entered: 07/25/2022 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Henry Aguila Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/19/2022. Appellant Henry Aguila opening brief due 09/09/2022. Appellee Penn Star Insurance Company answering brief due 10/11/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12491799] (JBS) [Entered: 07/12/2022 11:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PICO RIVERA FIRST MORTGAGE INVESTORS-LP is a litigant

Latest cases where THEE AGUILA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Penn-Star Insurance Company is a litigant